EP3130067 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A CONDUCTOR BAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Technology GmbH Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | [2017/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUBEL, Armin Im Roggebode 3D CH-5400 Baden / CH | 02 /
HILLMER, Thomas Wiesenweg 7 CH-Suhr 5034 / CH | 03 /
ANDERTON, Alexander Rene Sportweg 19 CH-5507 Mellingen / CH | 04 /
STEIN, Ruediger Schulstrasse 4 79804 Dogern / DE | [2017/07] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2017/07] | Fischer, Jens Peter General Electric Technology GmbH GE Corporate Intellectual Property Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 15709470.7 | 10.03.2015 | [2017/07] | WO2015EP54940 | Priority number, date | EP20140164220 | 10.04.2014 Original published format: EP 14164220 | [2017/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015154929 | Date: | 15.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3130067 | Date: | 15.02.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H02K15/12 | [2017/07] | CPC: |
H02K15/12 (EP,CN,US);
H02K15/0421 (US);
H02K15/105 (US);
H02K3/30 (US);
H02K3/345 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/07] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER STROMSCHIENE | [2017/07] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A CONDUCTOR BAR | [2017/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE BARRE CONDUCTRICE | [2017/07] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/07] | 22.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/10] | 29.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IY]EP0490705 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]) [I] 1,3 * column 4, line 11 - column 7, line 22; figures 3-5,6a,6b * [Y] 1,2; | [Y]EP0727863 (ABB MANAGEMENT AG [CH]) [Y] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]JPS5983564 (TOSHIBA KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | [I] - BOULTER E A ET AL, "Historical development of rotor and stator winding insulation materials and systems", IEEE ELECTRICAL INSULATION MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20040501), vol. 11, no. 3, ISSN 0883-7554, pages 25 - 39, XP011264986 [I] 1 * the whole document * |