EP3114707 - INTEGRATED DEVICE COMPRISING HIGH DENSITY INTERCONNECTS AND REDISTRIBUTION LAYERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.11.2020 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.12.2020 [2020/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2017/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Dong Wook 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
WE, Hong Bok 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
LEE, Jae Sik 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
GU, Shiqun 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2017/02] | Representative(s) | Howe, Steven Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/02] | Howe, Steven Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 15710373.0 | 04.03.2015 | [2017/02] | WO2015US18784 | Priority number, date | US201414196817 | 04.03.2014 Original published format: US201414196817 | [2017/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015134638 | Date: | 11.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3114707 | Date: | 11.01.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.09.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/538, H01L21/56, H01L21/60 | [2020/17] | CPC: |
H01L24/19 (EP,CN,US);
H01L23/3107 (CN,US);
H01L24/25 (CN,US);
H01L23/3157 (CN,US);
H01L23/5389 (EP,CN,US);
H01L24/24 (EP,CN,US);
H01L24/82 (EP,CN,US);
H01L24/96 (EP,CN,US);
H01L21/568 (EP,CN,US);
H01L2224/0401 (EP,CN,US);
H01L2224/04105 (EP,CN,US);
H01L2224/05572 (EP,CN,US);
H01L2224/12105 (EP,CN,US);
H01L2224/131 (EP,CN,US);
H01L2224/24137 (EP,CN,US);
H01L2924/014 (CN);
H01L2924/14335 (EP,CN,US);
H01L2924/1434 (EP,CN,US);
H01L2924/1815 (CN,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/131, H01L2924/014 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/02] | H01L23/538, H01L21/56 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/02] | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTE VORRICHTUNG MIT HOCHDICHTEN VERBINDUNGEN UND UMVERTEILUNGSSCHICHTEN | [2017/02] | English: | INTEGRATED DEVICE COMPRISING HIGH DENSITY INTERCONNECTS AND REDISTRIBUTION LAYERS | [2017/02] | French: | DISPOSITIF INTÉGRÉ COMPRENANT DES ÉLÉMENTS D'INTERCONNEXION À HAUTE DENSITÉ ET DES COUCHES DE REDISTRIBUTION | [2017/02] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.08.2016 | Examination requested [2017/02] | 26.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed (Time limit: M04) [2020/17] | 18.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/52] | 18.08.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2011316156 (PAGAILA REZA A [SG], et al) [X] 1,2,7,10-12,17,20-22,27,30 * paragraphs [0006] , [0037] , [0056] , [0075] , [0076]; figures 14,15 *; | [X]US2011316146 (PAGAILA REZA A [SG], et al) [X] 1,2,7,10-12,17,20-22,27,30* paragraphs [0035] , [0055] , [0056] , [0062]; figures 8,10 * |