08.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
01.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
24.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
17.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
10.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
03.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
05.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] |
26.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] |
19.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] |
12.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
05.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
22.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
15.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] |
25.12.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.01.2021 [2021/04] |
25.12.2020 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 27.01.2021 [2021/04] |
20.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.12.2020 [2020/52] |
06.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] |
30.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] |
23.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] |
16.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] |
02.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] |
28.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.09.2020 [2020/40] |
21.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.09.2020 [2020/39] |
14.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.09.2020 [2020/38] |
07.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2020 [2020/37] |
24.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2020 [2020/35] |
21.02.2020 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] |
17.01.2020 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
13.01.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
13.01.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
11.01.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
05.09.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
02.08.2019 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
22.04.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
30.03.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.03.2019 |
Change - German title |
published on 03.04.2019 [2019/14] |
01.03.2019 |
Change - French title |
published on 03.04.2019 [2019/14] |
22.02.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
23.11.2018 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
31.10.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
19.10.2018 |
First examination report |
|
30.03.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.05.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
26.05.2017 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 28.06.2017 [2017/26] |
26.05.2017 |
Change - extension states |
published on 28.06.2017 [2017/26] |
29.03.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.12.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.01.2017 [2017/04] |
23.12.2016 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
23.12.2016 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.01.2017 [2017/04] |
02.12.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.10.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.10.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.09.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
20.09.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.07.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.10.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.09.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.05.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.03.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|