Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2017208836 | Global Dossier | 27.07.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715482366 | 07.04.2017 | US201414200231 | 07.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106103697B | Global Dossier | 05.06.2020 | B | CN106103697 | 09.11.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015US17516 | 25.02.2015 | US201414200231 | 07.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2938052 | Global Dossier | 16.04.2024 | C | CA2938052 | 11.09.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015US17516 | 25.02.2015 | US201414200231 | 07.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3137635 | Global Dossier | 18.12.2019 | B1 | EP3137635 | 08.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015US17516 | 25.02.2015 | US201414200231 | 07.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA034933 | 08.04.2020 | B1 | EA201691804 | 28.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015US17516 | 25.02.2015 | US201414200231 | 07.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2771857T | 07.07.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2015US17516 | 25.02.2015 | US201414200231 | 07.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20200388T | 12.06.2020 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015US17516 | 25.02.2015 | EP15710983 | 25.02.2015 | US201414200231 | 07.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2016011494 | 20.12.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US20023114 | 07.03.2014 | WO2015US17516 | 25.02.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3137635T | 01.06.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2015US17516 | 25.02.2015 | EP15710983 | 25.02.2015 | US201414200231 | 07.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RS59936 | 31.03.2020 | B1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015US17516 | 25.02.2015 | EP15710983 | 25.02.2015 | US201414200231 | 07.03.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015134254 | Global Dossier | 11.09.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414200231 | 07.03.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9822334 | Global Dossier | 21.11.2017 | B2 | US2015250207 | 10.09.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414200231 | 07.03.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT3137635T | 21.01.2020 | T | Priority number | Date | US201414200231 | 07.03.2014 |