EP3113690 - TWO-PIECE KNOTLESS SUTURE ANCHOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.08.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.06.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Smith & Nephew, Inc. 1450 Brooks Road Memphis, TN 38116 / US | [2022/01] |
Former [2017/02] | For all designated states Smith&Nephew, Inc. 1450 Brooks Road Memphis, Tennessee 38116 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PATEL, Nehal Navinbhai 21 Washburn Street Apt. 2 Boston, Massachusetts 02125 / US | 02 /
KOSKI, Matthew Edwin 5 Webber Road Westford, Massachusetts 01886 / US | 03 /
KARASIC, Geoffrey Ian 261 Blue Hills Parkway Milton, Massachusetts 02186 / US | [2017/02] | Representative(s) | Smith & Nephew Group Legal Department PO Box 81 101 Hessle Road Hull HU3 2BN / GB | [2022/01] |
Former [2017/02] | Smith & Nephew Group Research Centre York Science Park Heslington York YO10 5DF / GB | Application number, filing date | 15711011.5 | 06.03.2015 | [2017/02] | WO2015US19175 | Priority number, date | US201461948929P | 06.03.2014 Original published format: US 201461948929 P | [2017/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015134872 | Date: | 11.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3113690 | Date: | 11.01.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3113690 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/04 | [2017/02] | CPC: |
A61B17/0401 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61B2017/0409 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61B2017/0412 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61B2017/0414 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61B2017/042 (US);
A61B2017/0424 (EP,CN,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZWEITEILIGER KNOTENLOSER NAHTANKER | [2017/02] | English: | TWO-PIECE KNOTLESS SUTURE ANCHOR | [2017/02] | French: | ÉLÉMENT D'ANCRAGE DE SUTURE SANS NOEUD EN DEUX PARTIES | [2017/02] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/02] | 17.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 06.08.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.11.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.03.2015 | AL | 05.01.2022 | AT | 05.01.2022 | CY | 05.01.2022 | CZ | 05.01.2022 | DK | 05.01.2022 | EE | 05.01.2022 | ES | 05.01.2022 | FI | 05.01.2022 | HR | 05.01.2022 | IT | 05.01.2022 | LT | 05.01.2022 | LV | 05.01.2022 | MC | 05.01.2022 | MK | 05.01.2022 | NL | 05.01.2022 | PL | 05.01.2022 | RO | 05.01.2022 | RS | 05.01.2022 | SE | 05.01.2022 | SI | 05.01.2022 | SK | 05.01.2022 | SM | 05.01.2022 | IE | 06.03.2022 | LU | 06.03.2022 | BE | 31.03.2022 | CH | 31.03.2022 | LI | 31.03.2022 | BG | 05.04.2022 | NO | 05.04.2022 | GR | 06.04.2022 | IS | 05.05.2022 | PT | 05.05.2022 | [2024/22] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 06.03.2015 | |
AL | 05.01.2022 | ||
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CY | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
IT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
IE | 06.03.2022 | ||
LU | 06.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 06.03.2015 | |
AL | 05.01.2022 | ||
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
IT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
IE | 06.03.2022 | ||
LU | 06.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
IT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
IE | 06.03.2022 | ||
LU | 06.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
IE | 06.03.2022 | ||
LU | 06.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
IE | 06.03.2022 | ||
LU | 06.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
IE | 06.03.2022 | ||
LU | 06.03.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 05.01.2022 | |
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 05.01.2022 | |
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 05.01.2022 | |
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | NL | 05.01.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5643321 (MCDEVITT DENNIS [US]) [X] 1-4,6,7,9,10 * column 4, line 38 - column 6, line 47 * * column 8, line 9 - column 9, line 20; figures 1-6, 9, 10 * [I] 5; | [I]EP1199035 (ETHICON INC [US]) [I] 1-10 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0052]; figures 1-4A *; | [Y]US2013267998 (VIJAY FRANCIS [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0119]; figure - *; | [Y]US2009248068 (LOMBARDO GIUSEPPE [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0044]; figure - *; | [A]US2011040327 (WEST JR HUGH SLOAN [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0097]; figures 11-23D * | International search | [XI]US5643321 (MCDEVITT DENNIS [US]) [X] 1-4,6,7,9,10 * column 4, line 38 - column 6, line 47 * * column 8, line 9 - column 9, line 20; figures 1-6, 9,10 * [I] 5; | [I]EP1199035 (ETHICON INC [US]) [I] 1-10 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0052]; figures 1-4a *; | [Y]US2009248068 (LOMBARDO GIUSEPPE [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0044]; figure - *; | [A]US2011040327 (WEST JR HUGH SLOAN [US], et al) [A] 1-10* paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0097]; figures 11-23D *; | [Y]US2013267998 (VIJAY FRANCIS [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0119]; figure - * |