EP3119385 - COMPOSITION COMPRISING CINNAMALDEHYDE AND ZINC TO IMPROVE SWALLOWING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.10.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Entre-deux-Villes 1800 Vevey / CH | [2019/28] |
Former [2017/04] | For all designated states Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MICHLIG GONZALEZ, Stéphanie Rue du Champ du Bois 18 CH-1052 Le Mont-sur-Lausanne / CH | 02 /
MEYLAN MERLINI, Jenny Ch. des Sauges 9 CH-1018 Lausanne / CH | 03 /
BURBIDGE, Adam Ch. des Granges 13 CH-1273 Arzier / CH | 04 /
LE COUTRE, Johannes Ch. du Fau-Blanc 32 CH-1009 Pully / CH | [2017/04] | Representative(s) | Rupp, Christian Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/46] | Rupp, Christian Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2018/17] | Chautard, Cécile Nestec S.A. Centre de Recherche Nestlé Vers-chez-les-Blanc Case Postale 44 1000 Lausanne 26 / CH | ||
Former [2017/04] | Chautard, Cécile Nestec S.A. CT-IAM Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | Application number, filing date | 15711116.2 | 17.03.2015 | [2017/04] | WO2015EP55479 | Priority number, date | US201461968105P | 20.03.2014 Original published format: US 201461968105 P | [2017/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015140124 | Date: | 24.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3119385 | Date: | 25.01.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3119385 | Date: | 25.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/17] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP3119385 | Date: | 11.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61P1/00, A61K31/11, A61K31/315 | [2017/47] | CPC: |
A61K33/30 (EP,US);
A23L29/015 (EP,US);
A23L29/03 (EP,US);
A23L33/10 (EP,US);
A23L33/115 (US);
A23L33/16 (EP,US);
A61K31/11 (EP,US);
A61K36/54 (EP,US);
A61K9/0056 (US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/11, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/315, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K33/30, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K36/54, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2017/04] | A61K31/11, A61K31/315 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/04] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ENTHALTEND ZIMTALDEHYD UND ZINK ZUR VERBESSERUNG BEIM SCHLUCKEN | [2017/46] | English: | COMPOSITION COMPRISING CINNAMALDEHYDE AND ZINC TO IMPROVE SWALLOWING | [2017/04] | French: | COMPOSITION CONTENANT DU CINNAMALDÉHYDE ET DU ZINC POUR AMÉLIORER LA DÉGLUTITION | [2017/47] |
Former [2017/04] | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT ZIMTALDEHYD UND ZINK ZUR VERBESSERUNG DES SCHLUCKENS | ||
Former [2017/04] | COMPOSITION COMPRENANT DU CINNAMALDÉHYDE ET DU ZINC POUR AMÉLIORER LA DÉGLUTITION | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/04] | 15.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
24.01.2019
ADMISSIBLE N.V. Nutricia Eerste Stationsstraat 186 2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL Opponent's representative Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2019/09] | 06.02.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.05.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 05.03.2020 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 05.03.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.04.2020 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 08.04.2020 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 07.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 01.10.2020 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.03.2015 | AL | 25.04.2018 | CY | 25.04.2018 | CZ | 25.04.2018 | EE | 25.04.2018 | HR | 25.04.2018 | LT | 25.04.2018 | LV | 25.04.2018 | MC | 25.04.2018 | MK | 25.04.2018 | PL | 25.04.2018 | RO | 25.04.2018 | RS | 25.04.2018 | SI | 25.04.2018 | SK | 25.04.2018 | SM | 25.04.2018 | BG | 25.07.2018 | NO | 25.07.2018 | GR | 26.07.2018 | IS | 25.08.2018 | PT | 27.08.2018 | IE | 17.03.2019 | LU | 17.03.2019 | MT | 17.03.2019 | BE | 31.03.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 17.03.2015 | |
AL | 25.04.2018 | ||
CY | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
IS | 25.08.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
IE | 17.03.2019 | ||
LU | 17.03.2019 | ||
MT | 17.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 25.04.2018 | |
CY | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
IS | 25.08.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
IE | 17.03.2019 | ||
LU | 17.03.2019 | ||
MT | 17.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 25.04.2018 | |
CY | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
IE | 17.03.2019 | ||
LU | 17.03.2019 | ||
MT | 17.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
IE | 17.03.2019 | ||
LU | 17.03.2019 | ||
MT | 17.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
IE | 17.03.2019 | ||
LU | 17.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
IE | 17.03.2019 | ||
LU | 17.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | AL | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
LU | 17.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | CZ | 25.04.2018 | |
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | CZ | 25.04.2018 | |
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | CZ | 25.04.2018 | |
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | CZ | 25.04.2018 | |
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | EE | 25.04.2018 | |
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | HR | 25.04.2018 | |
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | HR | 25.04.2018 | |
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | HR | 25.04.2018 | |
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | HR | 25.04.2018 | |
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | LT | 25.04.2018 | |
NO | 25.07.2018 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0128503 (NUTRASWEET CO [US]) [X] 11,12 * table 4 *; | [A]WO2005089206 (IRM LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * claim 1 *; | [AP]WO2015011037 (NESTEC SA [CH]) [AP] 1-15* paragraphs [0062] , [0066]; claim 1 *; | [A] - EBIHARA SATORU, "New therapeutic strategy of aspiration pneumonia using sensory stimuli", JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGICAL SCIENCES, & 83RD ANNUAL MEETING OF THE JAPANESE-PHARMACOLOGICAL-SOCIETY; OSAKA, JAPAN; MARCH 16 -18, 2010, (2010), vol. 112, no. Suppl. 1, ISSN 1347-8613, page 39P, XP009183785 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - EBIHARA TAKAE ET AL, "Effects of menthol on the triggering of the swallowing reflex in elderly patients with dysphagia", BRITISH JOURNAL OF CLINICAL PHARMACOLOGY, BLACKWELL SCIENTIFIC PUBL, GB, (20060901), vol. 62, no. 3, doi:10.1111/J.1365-2125.2006.02666.X, ISSN 0306-5251, pages 369 - 371, XP009114215 [A] 1-15 * see under Discussion * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2125.2006.02666.x | [A] - LAIA ROFES ET AL, "Neuogenic and oropharyngeal dysphagia", ANNALS OF THE NEW YORK ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (20131001), vol. 1300, no. 1, doi:10.1111/nyas.12234, ISSN 0077-8923, pages 1 - 10, XP055183479 [A] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/nyas.12234 | Opposition | EP0436284 | JP2000279107 | WO03055334 | CN101810336 | - APPEL V et al., "Meals for easy swallowing", MDA, (20050000), pages 1 - 114, XP055553775 | - Living with ALS resource guide 8; | - Whole milk, nutrition facts; | - BURNHAM P, "Cinnamaldehyde, the smell and flavour of cinnamon", Molecule of the month, (20060800), XP055553790 | - Nutrition data USDA Instant coffee; | - Nutrition data USDA Vanilla Ice Cream; | - HU H. et al., "Zinc activates damage-sensing TRPA1 channels", Nat Chem Biol, (20090000), vol. 5, no. 3, pages 183 - 190, XP055553792 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nchembio.146 | - EBIHARA S et al., "Sensory stimulation to improve swallowing reflex and prevent aspiration pneumonia in elderly dysphagic people", J Pharmacol Sci, (20110000), vol. 115, pages 99 - 104, XP055183480 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1254/jphs.10R05CP | - Nutrition data USDA whole egg; | - APPEL V et al., "Meals for easy swallowing", MDA, (20050000), pages 1 - 114 | - EBIHARA S et al., "Sensory stimulation to improve swallowing reflex and prevent aspiration pneumonia in elderly dysphagic people", J Pharmacol Sci, (20110000), vol. 115, pages 99 - 104 | - Rofes Laia; Arreola Viridiana; Martin Alberto, "Effect of oral piperine on the swallow response of patients with oropharyngeal dysphagia", Journal of gastroenterlogy, JP, (20131211), vol. 49, no. 12, doi:10.1007/s00535-013-0920-0, ISSN 0944-1174, pages 1517 - 1523 |