EP3125900 - TREATMENT OF COGNITIVE DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.12.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.01.2018 [2018/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Algiax Pharmaceuticals GmbH Max-Planck-Straße 15a 40699 Erkrath / DE | [2017/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOOPMANS, Guido Algiax Pharmaceuticals GmbH Max-Planck-Strasse 15a 40699 Erkrath / DE | 02 /
HASSE, Birgit Algiax Pharmaceuticals GmbH Max-Planck-Strasse 15a 40699 Erkrath / DE | [2017/06] | Representative(s) | Roth, Andy Stefan Dr. Roth Patentanwaltskanzlei Kaistrasse 5 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/06] | Roth, Andy Stefan Dr. Roth Patentanwaltskanzlei Columbusstrasse 22 40549 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 15711187.3 | 20.03.2015 | [2017/06] | WO2015EP55989 | Priority number, date | EP20140001150 | 28.03.2014 Original published format: EP 14001150 | US201461971799P | 28.03.2014 Original published format: US 201461971799 P | [2017/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015144598 | Date: | 01.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3125900 | Date: | 08.02.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/53, A61K31/27, A61K31/445, A61K31/06, A61P25/00, A61P25/28, A61P43/00 | [2017/06] | CPC: |
A61K31/53 (EP,US);
A61K31/27 (EP,US);
A61K31/445 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/27, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/445, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/53, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/06] | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG VON KOGNITIVEN STÖRUNGEN | [2017/06] | English: | TREATMENT OF COGNITIVE DISORDERS | [2017/06] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE TROUBLES COGNITIFS | [2017/06] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/06] | 13.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/03] | 30.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2018/03] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]WO02098879 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,7-9,11,12,14 * examples 7,8; claims 1-3 * * page 14, line 29 * * page 14, lines 4-8 * [Y] 1-14 [I] 6; | [XY]WO2012123406 (ALGIAX PHARMACEUTICALS GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-9,11-14 * abstract * * page 8, lines 10-16 * * page 12, lines 12-14 * [Y] 10; | [Y]EP2116240 (COLD SPRING HARBOR LAB [US]) [Y] 1-14 * abstract *; | [Y]EP1203584 (M D M S R L [IT]) [Y] 10 * abstract *; | [Y]WO2006135828 (MEMORY PHARM CORP [US], et al) [Y] 10 * abstract *; | [A]US2004097498 (NIEWOHNER ULRICH [DE], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0404] * | [Y] - JACOBSEN F M ET AL, "DONEPEZIL FOR PSYCHOTROPIC-INDUCED MEMORY LOSS", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL PSYCHIATRY, PHYSICIANS POSTGRADUATE PRESS, INC, US, (19991001), vol. 60, no. 10, ISSN 0160-6689, pages 698 - 704, XP000892626 [Y] 10 * abstract * | [Y] - LISA Y M CHUAH ET AL, "Memory effects of Donepezil During sleep Deprivation - Donepezil Improves Episodic Memory in Young Individuals Vulnerable to the Effects of Sleep Deprivation", SLEEP COGNITIVE NEUROSCIENCE LAB 2009, (20090101), vol. 32, no. 8, pages 999 - 1010, XP055189294 [Y] 10 * abstract * | [Y] - DIMITROVA D ET AL, "P.5.b.004 Comparative study of the effects of tacrine, donepezil and galantamine on scopolamine-induced impaired memory in rats", EUROPEAN NEUROPSYCHOPHARMACOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 19, ISSN 0924-977X, (20090901), pages S626 - S627, (20090901), XP026795689 [Y] 10 * abstract * | [Y] - "P.5.010 Effects of rivastigmine on learning and short memory retention in rats with hypoxia-induced model of amnesia", EUROPEAN NEUROPSYCHOPHARMACOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 15, ISSN 0924-977X, (20050101), pages S561 - S562, (20050101), XP027808948 [Y] 10 * abstract * | [Y] - WEZENBERG E ET AL, "Modulation of memory and visuospatial processes by biperiden and rivastigmine in elderly healthy subjects", PSYCHOPHARMACOLOGY, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20050901), vol. 181, no. 3, doi:10.1007/S00213-005-0083-7, ISSN 1432-2072, pages 582 - 594, XP019326595 [Y] 10 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00213-005-0083-7 | [Y] - MARTINEZ-CORIA H ET AL, "P.5.b.005 Combination of memantine and donepezil reverses cognitive deficits in transgenic mice with Alzheimer-type pathology", EUROPEAN NEUROPSYCHOPHARMACOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 19, ISSN 0924-977X, (20090901), page S627, (20090901), XP026795690 [Y] 10 * abstract * |