EP3123344 - METHOD FOR DATA TRANSFER BETWEEN REAL-TIME TASKS USING A DMA MEMORY CONTROLLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.08.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives 25, Rue Leblanc Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 75015 Paris / FR | [2017/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAN, Mathieu 18 Rue La Bruyère F-91600 Savigny-sur-Orge / FR | 02 /
DEBICKI, Olivier 369 Grand Rue F-38660 Saint-Vincent de Mercuze / FR | [2017/50] |
Former [2017/05] | 01 /
JAN, Mathieu 18 rue La Bruyère F-91600 Savigny-sur-Orge / FR | ||
02 /
DEBICKI, Olivier 369 Grand Rue F-38660 Saint-Vincent de Mercuze / FR | Representative(s) | Hnich-Gasri, Naïma, et al Marks & Clerk France Immeuble Visium 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [2017/05] | Application number, filing date | 15711708.6 | 17.03.2015 | [2017/05] | WO2015EP55512 | Priority number, date | FR20140052497 | 25.03.2014 Original published format: FR 1452497 | [2017/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015144488 | Date: | 01.10.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3123344 | Date: | 01.02.2017 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3123344 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/28 | [2017/05] | CPC: |
G06F13/28 (EP,US);
G06F3/061 (US);
G06F3/0647 (US);
G06F3/0673 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DATENÜBERTRAGUNG ZWISCHEN ECHTZEITAUFGABEN UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES DMA-SPEICHER-STEUERGERÄTS | [2017/05] | English: | METHOD FOR DATA TRANSFER BETWEEN REAL-TIME TASKS USING A DMA MEMORY CONTROLLER | [2017/05] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRANSFERT DE DONNEES ENTRE TACHES TEMPS REEL UTILISANT UN CONTROLEUR MEMOIRE DMA | [2017/05] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/05] | 16.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.03.2015 | AL | 13.12.2017 | AT | 13.12.2017 | CY | 13.12.2017 | CZ | 13.12.2017 | DK | 13.12.2017 | EE | 13.12.2017 | ES | 13.12.2017 | FI | 13.12.2017 | HR | 13.12.2017 | IT | 13.12.2017 | LT | 13.12.2017 | LV | 13.12.2017 | MC | 13.12.2017 | MK | 13.12.2017 | MT | 13.12.2017 | NL | 13.12.2017 | PL | 13.12.2017 | PT | 13.12.2017 | RO | 13.12.2017 | RS | 13.12.2017 | SE | 13.12.2017 | SI | 13.12.2017 | SK | 13.12.2017 | SM | 13.12.2017 | TR | 13.12.2017 | BG | 13.03.2018 | NO | 13.03.2018 | GR | 14.03.2018 | IE | 17.03.2018 | LU | 17.03.2018 | BE | 31.03.2018 | CH | 31.03.2018 | LI | 31.03.2018 | IS | 13.04.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 17.03.2015 | |
AT | 13.12.2017 | ||
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
MK | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PT | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
TR | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IE | 17.03.2018 | ||
LU | 17.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 17.03.2015 | |
AT | 13.12.2017 | ||
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PT | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
TR | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IE | 17.03.2018 | ||
LU | 17.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PT | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
TR | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IE | 17.03.2018 | ||
LU | 17.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
TR | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IE | 17.03.2018 | ||
LU | 17.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IE | 17.03.2018 | ||
LU | 17.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IE | 17.03.2018 | ||
LU | 17.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LU | 17.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 13.12.2017 | |
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | FI | 13.12.2017 | |
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 13.12.2017 | |
NO | 13.03.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2008126601 (HAYASHI ATSUSHI [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2007003986 (FREESCALE SEMICONDUCTOR INC [US]; SHASHA URI [IL]; GURFINKEL SAGI [IL]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |