EP3129715 - LIGHTING MODULE FOR A HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCE, AND HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.09.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2017/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FEISTHAMMEL, Egon Joseph Loreyestrasse 7 76437 Rastatt / DE | 02 /
GROMER, Andreas 12, rue Docteur Albert Schweizer 67640 Fergersheim / FR | 03 /
KLEINBUB, Guido Hirschweg 5 76477 Elchesheim-Illingen / DE | 04 /
LEBRUN, Yves 11 Rue des Faisans 67114 Eschau / FR | [2017/09] |
Former [2017/07] | 01 /
FEISTHAMMEL, Egon Joseph Loreyestrasse 7 76437 Rastatt / DE | ||
02 /
GROMER, Andreas 16 Rue de Roses 67640 Lipsheim / FR | |||
03 /
KLEINBUB, Guido Hirschweg 5 76477 Elchesheim-Illingen / DE | |||
04 /
LEBRUN, Yves 11 Rue des Faisans 67114 Eschau / FR | Application number, filing date | 15712155.9 | 26.03.2015 | [2017/07] | WO2015EP56586 | Priority number, date | EP20140290103 | 10.04.2014 Original published format: EP 14290103 | [2017/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015155020 | Date: | 15.10.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3129715 | Date: | 15.02.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3129715 | Date: | 10.05.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F24C15/20 | [2017/07] | CPC: |
F24C15/2064 (EP,US);
F24C15/008 (EP);
F24C7/082 (EP);
F25D27/005 (EP);
H05B47/11 (EP);
H05B47/125 (EP,US);
Y02B20/40 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BELEUCHTUNGSMODUL FÜR HAUSHALTSGERÄT UND HAUSHALTSGERÄT | [2017/07] | English: | LIGHTING MODULE FOR A HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCE, AND HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCE | [2017/07] | French: | MODULE D'ÉCLAIRAGE D'UN APPAREIL MÉNAGER ET APPAREIL MÉNAGER | [2017/07] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/07] | 10.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 21.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 10.05.2023 | DK | 10.05.2023 | EE | 10.05.2023 | ES | 10.05.2023 | FI | 10.05.2023 | HR | 10.05.2023 | LT | 10.05.2023 | LV | 10.05.2023 | NL | 10.05.2023 | PL | 10.05.2023 | RO | 10.05.2023 | RS | 10.05.2023 | SE | 10.05.2023 | SI | 10.05.2023 | SK | 10.05.2023 | SM | 10.05.2023 | NO | 10.08.2023 | GR | 11.08.2023 | IS | 10.09.2023 | PT | 11.09.2023 | [2024/24] |
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 10.05.2023 | |
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 10.05.2023 | |
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | ES | 10.05.2023 | |
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | ES | 10.05.2023 | |
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 10.05.2023 | |
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 10.05.2023 | |
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 10.05.2023 | |
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 10.05.2023 | |
PT | 11.09.2023 | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE29919452U (ATAG KITCHEN GROUP BV [NL]) [Y] 7 * abstract *; | [A]DE102004055943 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 1-12* abstract *; | [XYI]WO2011139280 (BROAN NU TONE LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,8-12 * the whole document * [Y] 7 [I] 5 | Examination | DE102010006697 | DE102011086968 | US8997732 |