EP3119810 - METHODS FOR REDUCING CARDIOVASCULAR RISK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.12.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.01.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HR, RS | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanofi Biotechnology 82 Avenue Raspail 94250 Gentilly / FR | For all designated states Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 777 Old Saw Mill River Road Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/09] | For all designated states Sanofi Biotechnology 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 777 Old Saw Mill River Road Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | |||
Former [2017/04] | For all designated states Sanofi Biotechnology 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 777 Old Saw Mill River Road Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BESSAC, Laurence c/o Sanofi 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | 02 /
HANOTIN, Corinne c/o Sanofi 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | 03 /
PORDY, Robert, C. c/o Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, INC. 777 Old Saw Mill River Road Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | 04 /
SASIELA, William, J. c/o Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, INC. 777 Old Saw Mill River Road Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | 05 /
SCHWARTZ, Gregory, G. c/o Va Medical Center, Cardiology Section 1055 Clermont Street (111B) Denver, CO 80220 / US | 06 /
STEG, Philippe Gabriel Université Paris Diderot and Cardiology Department Centre Hospitalier Bichat, Assistance Publique Hopitaux de Paris 46 rue Henri Huchard 75877 Paris Cedex 18 / FR | [2017/04] | Representative(s) | Zwicker, Jörk ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [2024/09] |
Former [2017/04] | Rai, Monika, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 15712241.7 | 13.03.2015 | [2017/04] | WO2015US20564 | Priority number, date | US201461954094P | 17.03.2014 Original published format: US 201461954094 P | US201462025400P | 16.07.2014 Original published format: US 201462025400 P | US201462043182P | 28.08.2014 Original published format: US 201462043182 P | EP20150305293 | 26.02.2015 Original published format: EP 15305293 | [2017/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015142668 | Date: | 24.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3119810 | Date: | 25.01.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3119810 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/40, A61K39/395, A61P9/00 | [2017/04] | CPC: |
C07K16/40 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/40 (EP,IL,US);
A61K31/505 (EP,IL,US);
A61K39/39558 (EP,IL,US);
A61P43/00 (EP,IL);
A61P9/00 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P9/10 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K2039/505 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K2300/00 (IL);
C07K2317/76 (EP,IL,KR,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/40, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/505, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K39/39558, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/04] | Extension states | BA | 13.10.2016 | ME | 13.10.2016 | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | METHODEN ZUR VERMINDERUNG VON KARDIOVASKULÄREM RISIKO | [2023/52] | English: | METHODS FOR REDUCING CARDIOVASCULAR RISK | [2017/04] | French: | MÉTHODE POUR LA RÉDUCTION DE RISQUE CARDIOVASCULAIRE | [2023/52] |
Former [2017/04] | VERFAHREN ZUR REDUZIERUNG DES KARDIOVASKULÄREN RISIKOS | ||
Former [2017/04] | MÉTHODES PERMETTANT DE RÉDUIRE LE RISQUE CARDIOVASCULAIRE | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/04] | 13.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 18.06.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 14.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Appeal following examination | 16.08.2019 | Appeal received No. T3165/19 | 28.10.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 09.01.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | 20.01.2023 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | Divisional application(s) | EP24160083.2 / EP4403213 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HR | 28.02.2024 | NO | 28.05.2024 | RS | 28.05.2024 | IS | 28.06.2024 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/33] | NO | 28.05.2024 | |
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 28.06.2024 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2010077854 (REGENERON PHARAMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al); | by applicant | US6596541 | US2010166768 | US8062640 |