EP3120435 - METHOD AND SYSTEM TO PREVENT BUS VOLTAGE SAGGING WHEN AN ORING-FET IN AN N+1 REDUNDANT POWER SUPPLY CONFIGURATION IS FAULTY DURING POWER UP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2019 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.10.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cisco Technology, Inc. 170 West Tasman Drive San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2017/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANG, Weizhong CISCO TECHNOLOGY INC. 170 West Tasman Drive San Jose, California 95134 / US | 02 /
BAEK, Sung Kee CISCO TECHNOLOGY INC. 170 West Tasman Drive San Jose, California 95134 / US | 03 /
ZIMMERMAN, Craig CISCO TECHNOLOGY INC. 170 West Tasman Drive San Jose, California 95134 / US | [2017/04] | Representative(s) | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/04] | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 15712483.5 | 11.03.2015 | [2017/04] | WO2015US20028 | Priority number, date | US201414220905 | 20.03.2014 Original published format: US201414220905 | [2017/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015142592 | Date: | 24.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3120435 | Date: | 25.01.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3120435 | Date: | 09.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H02J1/10 | [2017/04] | CPC: |
G06F1/26 (EP,US);
H02M1/32 (CN);
H02H7/1213 (US);
G06F11/16 (US);
G06F11/2015 (EP,US);
H03K17/0822 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR VERMEIDUNG VON BUSSPANNUNGSABFÄLLEN BEI EINEM DEFEKT EINES ORING-FET IN EINER N+1-REDUNDANTEN STROMVERSORGUNGSKONFIGURATION WÄHREND DES EINSCHALTENS | [2017/04] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM TO PREVENT BUS VOLTAGE SAGGING WHEN AN ORING-FET IN AN N+1 REDUNDANT POWER SUPPLY CONFIGURATION IS FAULTY DURING POWER UP | [2017/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME PERMETTANT DE PRÉVENIR UN AFFAISSEMENT DE LA TENSION DE BUS LORSQU'UN TRANSISTOR À EFFET DE CHAMP D'EXÉCUTION DE L'OPÉRATION OU DANS UNE CONFIGURATION D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE REDONDANTE N + 1 EST DÉFECTUEUX DURANT LA MISE SOUS TENSION | [2017/04] | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.08.2016 | Examination requested [2017/04] | 01.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.03.2015 | AL | 09.05.2018 | AT | 09.05.2018 | CY | 09.05.2018 | CZ | 09.05.2018 | DK | 09.05.2018 | EE | 09.05.2018 | ES | 09.05.2018 | FI | 09.05.2018 | HR | 09.05.2018 | IT | 09.05.2018 | LT | 09.05.2018 | LV | 09.05.2018 | MC | 09.05.2018 | MK | 09.05.2018 | NL | 09.05.2018 | PL | 09.05.2018 | RO | 09.05.2018 | RS | 09.05.2018 | SE | 09.05.2018 | SI | 09.05.2018 | SK | 09.05.2018 | SM | 09.05.2018 | TR | 09.05.2018 | BG | 09.08.2018 | NO | 09.08.2018 | GR | 10.08.2018 | IS | 09.09.2018 | PT | 10.09.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 11.03.2015 | |
AL | 09.05.2018 | ||
AT | 09.05.2018 | ||
CY | 09.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
TR | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
IS | 09.09.2018 | ||
PT | 10.09.2018 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 09.05.2018 | |
AT | 09.05.2018 | ||
CY | 09.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
TR | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
IS | 09.09.2018 | ||
PT | 10.09.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 09.05.2018 | |
AT | 09.05.2018 | ||
CY | 09.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
TR | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
PT | 10.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 09.05.2018 | |
AT | 09.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
TR | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
PT | 10.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 09.05.2018 | |
AT | 09.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
TR | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 09.05.2018 | |
AT | 09.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 09.05.2018 | |
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 09.05.2018 | |
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 09.05.2018 | |
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 09.05.2018 | |
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 09.05.2018 | |
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 09.05.2018 | |
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 09.05.2018 | |
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | ES | 09.05.2018 | |
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | ES | 09.05.2018 | |
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | ES | 09.05.2018 | |
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 09.05.2018 | |
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]WO2008025490 (KNORR BREMSE SYSTEME [DE], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2-7,9-14[I] 8; | [XAI]US7379282 (ZANSKY ZOLTAN [US]) [X] 1 * column 4, line 29 - column 4, line 59; figures 2-4 * [A] 2-7,9-14 [I] 8 |