EP3120559 - POC VALUE DESIGN FOR MULTI-LAYER VIDEO CODING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.12.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.05.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2017/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HENDRY, Fnu 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
RAMASUBRAMONIAN, Adarsh Krishnan 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
WANG, Ye-Kui 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2017/04] | Representative(s) | Loveless, Ian Mark Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [2021/21] |
Former [2017/04] | Loveless, Ian Mark Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 15712776.2 | 17.03.2015 | [2017/04] | WO2015US21065 | Priority number, date | US201461954551P | 17.03.2014 Original published format: US 201461954551 P | US201461973104P | 31.03.2014 Original published format: US 201461973104 P | US201514659213 | 16.03.2015 Original published format: US201514659213 | [2017/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015142921 | Date: | 24.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3120559 | Date: | 25.01.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3120559 | Date: | 26.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/597, H04N19/105, H04N19/70, H04N19/46, H04N19/30, H04N19/68 | [2017/04] | CPC: |
H04N19/70 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/597 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/105 (EP,US);
H04N19/172 (KR);
H04N19/187 (KR);
H04N19/30 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POC-WERT DESIGN FÜR DIE MEHRSCHICHTIGE VIDEOCODIERUNG | [2020/51] | English: | POC VALUE DESIGN FOR MULTI-LAYER VIDEO CODING | [2017/04] | French: | CONCEPTION DE VALEURS POC POUR LE CODAGE VIDÉO MULTICOUCHE | [2020/51] |
Former [2017/04] | POC-WERTE-KONZEPT FÜR MEHRSCHICHTIGE VIDEOCODIERUNG | ||
Former [2017/04] | CONCEPTION DE VALEUR (POC) POUR UN CODAGE VIDÉO MULTICOUCHE | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/04] | 06.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.04.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.03.2015 | AL | 26.05.2021 | AT | 26.05.2021 | CY | 26.05.2021 | CZ | 26.05.2021 | DK | 26.05.2021 | EE | 26.05.2021 | FI | 26.05.2021 | HR | 26.05.2021 | LT | 26.05.2021 | LV | 26.05.2021 | MC | 26.05.2021 | MK | 26.05.2021 | MT | 26.05.2021 | PL | 26.05.2021 | RO | 26.05.2021 | RS | 26.05.2021 | SI | 26.05.2021 | SK | 26.05.2021 | SM | 26.05.2021 | BG | 26.08.2021 | NO | 26.08.2021 | GR | 27.08.2021 | IS | 26.09.2021 | PT | 27.09.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 17.03.2015 | |
AL | 26.05.2021 | ||
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
CY | 26.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
MK | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 17.03.2015 | |
AL | 26.05.2021 | ||
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
CY | 26.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 17.03.2015 | |
AL | 26.05.2021 | ||
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 26.05.2021 | |
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 26.05.2021 | |
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 26.05.2021 | |
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | Cited in | International search | [I] - CHEN J ET AL, "High efficiency video coding (HEVC) scalable extension Draft 5", 16. JCT-VC MEETING; 9-1-2014 - 17-1-2014; SAN JOSE; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20140122), no. JCTVC-P1008-v4, XP030115882 [I] 1-29 * paragraph [F.7.4.7.1] * | [I] - ADARSH K RAMASUBRAMONIAN ET AL, "MV-HEVC/SHVC HLS: On picture order count", JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING (JCT-VC) OF ITU-T SG 16 WP 3 AND ISO/IEC JTC 1/SC 29/WG 11. JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON 3D VIDEO CODING EXTENSIONS OF ITU-T SG 16 WP 3 AND ISO/IEC JTC 1/SC 29/WG 11,, (20131121), no. JCTVC-00213 v3, pages 1 - 11, XP007922965 [I] 1-29 * paragraph [3.1.2] * | [A] - HENDRY ET AL, "MV-HEVC/SHVC HLS: On picture order count", 16. JCT-VC MEETING; 9-1-2014 - 17-1-2014; SAN JOSE; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20140102), no. JCTVC-P0041-v6, XP030115502 [A] 1-29 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0004] * | [A] - RAMASUBRAMONIAN A K ET AL, "MV-HEVC/SHVC HLS: Additional information on the POC design in JCTVC-P0041/JCT3V-G0031", 16. JCT-VC MEETING; 9-1-2014 - 17-1-2014; SAN JOSE; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20140110), no. JCTVC-P0260, XP030115806 [A] 1-29 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0004] * | [A] - LEE H ET AL, "MV-HEVC/SHVC HLS: On poc reset for long-term reference pictures", 15. JCT-VC MEETING; 23-10-2013 - 1-11-2013; GENEVA; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20131014), no. JCTVC-O0128, XP030115134 [A] 1-29 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * | [A] - RICKARD SJOBERG ET AL, "Overview of HEVC High-Level Syntax and Reference Picture Management", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20121201), vol. 22, no. 12, doi:10.1109/TCSVT.2012.2223052, ISSN 1051-8215, pages 1858 - 1870, XP011487804 [A] 1-29 * paragraph [0III] - paragraph [0VII] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCSVT.2012.2223052 | [IP] - HENDRY ET AL, "MV-HEVC/SHVC HLS: On extraction of independent non-base layer", 17. JCT-VC MEETING; 27-3-2014 - 4-4-2014; VALENCIA; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20140403), no. JCTVC-Q0142-v2, XP030116076 [IP] 1-29 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * figures 1,2 * | [IP] - HENDRY ET AL, "MV-HEVC/SHVC HLS: On extraction of independent non-base layer", 17. JCT-VC MEETING; 27-3-2014 - 4-4-2014; VALENCIA; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20140318), no. JCTVC-Q0142, XP030116075 [IP] 1-29 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * figures 1,2 * | [AP] - RAMASUBRAMONIAN A K ET AL, "MV-HEVC/SHVC HLS: On picture order count and related", 17. JCT-VC MEETING; 27-3-2014 - 4-4-2014; VALENCIA; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20140318), no. JCTVC-Q0146, XP030116080 [AP] 1-29 * paragraph [0001] * * figures 1-2 * | [AP] - HENDRY ET AL, "MV-HEVC/SHVC HLS: On POC", 18. JCT-VC MEETING; 30-6-2014 - 9-7-2014; SAPPORO; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20140621), no. JCTVC-R0223, XP030116523 [AP] 1-29 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0003] * |