EP3122956 - INSULATION BRICK FOR A MULTI-LAYERED WALL, MULTI-LAYER WALL PROVIDED THEREWITH AND BUILDING BUILT FROM SAME, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A MULTI-LAYERED WALL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.02.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kellerer, Michael Ortsstrasse 18a 82281 Oberweikertshofen / DE | [2017/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2017/05] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [2021/30] |
Former [2017/05] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 15712840.6 | 19.03.2015 | [2017/05] | WO2015EP55802 | Priority number, date | DE201410104319 | 27.03.2014 Original published format: DE102014104319 | [2017/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015144559 | Date: | 01.10.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3122956 | Date: | 01.02.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3122956 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | E04F13/08, E04C2/288, E04C1/41, E04B2/02, E04B1/94, E04B1/76, E04F13/14, B29K25/00, B29K75/00, B29C44/18, B29L31/00 | [2021/08] | CPC: |
E04F13/0819 (EP);
B29C44/188 (EP);
E04B1/762 (EP);
E04B1/942 (EP);
E04B2/02 (EP);
E04C1/41 (EP);
E04F13/083 (EP);
E04F13/0875 (EP);
E04F13/14 (EP);
B29K2025/06 (EP);
B29K2075/00 (EP);
B29K2995/0015 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2017/05] | E04F13/08, E04F13/14, E04B1/76, E04B1/94, E04B2/02, E04C1/41, E04C2/288 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DÄMMZIEGEL FÜR EINE MEHRSCHICHTIGE WAND, DAMIT VERSEHENE MEHRSCHICHTIGE WAND SOWIE HIERAUS AUSGEBILDETES GEBÄUDE UND VERFAHREN ZUM ERSTELLEN EINER MEHRSCHICHTIGEN WAND | [2017/05] | English: | INSULATION BRICK FOR A MULTI-LAYERED WALL, MULTI-LAYER WALL PROVIDED THEREWITH AND BUILDING BUILT FROM SAME, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A MULTI-LAYERED WALL | [2017/05] | French: | BRIQUE D'ISOLATION POUR MUR MULTICOUCHE, MUR MULTICOUCHE POURVU D'UNE TELLE BRIQUE ET BÂTIMENT FORMÉ À UN TEL MUR ET PROCÉDÉ D'ÉRECTION D'UN MUR MULTICOUCHE | [2017/05] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/05] | 22.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.03.2015 | AL | 28.07.2021 | CY | 28.07.2021 | DK | 28.07.2021 | EE | 28.07.2021 | ES | 28.07.2021 | FI | 28.07.2021 | HR | 28.07.2021 | LT | 28.07.2021 | LV | 28.07.2021 | MC | 28.07.2021 | MK | 28.07.2021 | NL | 28.07.2021 | RO | 28.07.2021 | RS | 28.07.2021 | SE | 28.07.2021 | SI | 28.07.2021 | SK | 28.07.2021 | SM | 28.07.2021 | TR | 28.07.2021 | BG | 28.10.2021 | NO | 28.10.2021 | GR | 29.10.2021 | IS | 28.11.2021 | PT | 29.11.2021 | IE | 19.03.2022 | LU | 19.03.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 19.03.2015 | |
AL | 28.07.2021 | ||
CY | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
MK | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
IE | 19.03.2022 | ||
LU | 19.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 19.03.2015 | |
AL | 28.07.2021 | ||
CY | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
IE | 19.03.2022 | ||
LU | 19.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 19.03.2015 | |
AL | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
IE | 19.03.2022 | ||
LU | 19.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
IE | 19.03.2022 | ||
LU | 19.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | DK | 28.07.2021 | |
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | DK | 28.07.2021 | |
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | DK | 28.07.2021 | |
ES | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | ES | 28.07.2021 | |
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | ES | 28.07.2021 | |
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | ES | 28.07.2021 | |
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 28.07.2021 | |
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE2048387 (AGROP AG) [Y] 1-17 * page 2, line 2 - page 5, line 3; figure 1 *; | [Y]FR2573110 (ENTREPRISES CONST SOC GEN [FR]) [Y] 1-17 * page 4, line 34 - page 6, line 25; figures 1,3 *; | [Y]WO9011419 (MARIANI ROMEO [IT]) [Y] 1-17 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0397598 (FERRARA SANTO [CH]) [Y] 1-17 * column 1, line 29 - column 2, line 30; figures 1,2 *; | [YD]DE102004043494 (MAIER HERBERT [DE]) [YD] 1-17 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0026]; figures 1,3,5 *; | [Y]EP1936067 (TERREAL [FR]) [Y] 1-17 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0024]; figure 1 *; | [Y]GB2497569 (ENVIRUP LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-17* abstract * |