EP3119752 - 3,4-DIAMINO-6-CHLOROPYRAZINE-2-CARBOXAMIDE COMPOUNDS FOR THE TREATMENT OF ENAC MEDIATED DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/04] | CHEMICAL COMPOUNDS | ||
[2017/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2019 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.10.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Astrazeneca AB 151 85 Södertälje / SE | [2017/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERGLUND, Susanne, Elisabeth AstraZeneca SE-431 83 Mölndal / SE | 02 /
CONNOLLY, Stephen c/o AstraZeneca Intellectual Property Alderley Park Macclesfield Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | 03 /
HEMMERLING, Martin AstraZeneca SE-431 83 Mölndal / SE | 04 /
HOSSAIN, Nafizal AstraZeneca SE-431 83 Mölndal / SE | 05 /
KRISTOFFERSSON, Anna c/o AstraZeneca Intellectual Property Alderley Park Macclesfield Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | 06 /
LUNDKVIST, Johan, Rune, Michael c/o AstraZeneca Intellectual Property Alderley Park Macclesfield Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | 07 /
NIKITIDIS, Grigorios AstraZeneca SE-431 83 Mölndal / SE | 08 /
RIPA, Lena, Elisabeth AstraZeneca SE-431 83 Mölndal / SE | 09 /
SHAMOVSKY, Igor AstraZeneca R&D Mölndal SE-431 83 Mölndal / SE | [2017/04] | Representative(s) | AstraZeneca Intellectual Property Eastbrook House Shaftesbury Road Cambridge CB2 8BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/20] | AstraZeneca Milstein Building Granta Park Cambridge CB21 6GH / GB | ||
Former [2017/04] | Cook, Andrew James AstraZeneca Intellectual Property Mereside Alderley Park Macclesfield, Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | Application number, filing date | 15713339.8 | 17.03.2015 | [2017/04] | WO2015GB50765 | Priority number, date | US201461954674P | 18.03.2014 Original published format: US 201461954674 P | [2017/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015140527 | Date: | 24.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3119752 | Date: | 25.01.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3119752 | Date: | 16.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/06, C07D241/28, A61K31/497, A61P11/00 | [2017/04] | CPC: |
C07D401/12 (EP,KR,US);
C07D401/06 (EP,IL,US);
C07D241/28 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/4965 (EP,US);
A61K31/497 (EP,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (KR,US);
A61P11/00 (EP,US);
A61P11/06 (KR,US);
A61P3/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/04] | Extension states | BA | 18.10.2016 | ME | 18.10.2016 | Validation states | MA | 18.10.2016 | Title | German: | 3,4-DIAMINO-6-CHLOROPYRAZINE-2-CARBOXAMID-VERBINDUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ENAC-VERMITTELTEN KRANKHEITEN | [2017/44] | English: | 3,4-DIAMINO-6-CHLOROPYRAZINE-2-CARBOXAMIDE COMPOUNDS FOR THE TREATMENT OF ENAC MEDIATED DISEASES | [2017/43] | French: | COMPOSÉS DE 3,4-DIAMINO-6-CHLOROPYRAZINE-2-CARBOXAMIDE UTILES POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES MÉDIÉES PAR LE ENAC | [2017/43] |
Former [2017/04] | CHEMISCHE VERBINDUNGEN | ||
Former [2017/04] | CHEMICAL COMPOUNDS | ||
Former [2017/04] | COMPOSÉS CHIMIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/04] | 28.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 16.05.2018 | MC | 16.05.2018 | [2019/51] |
Former [2019/46] | MC | 16.05.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2009150137 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-13* claims 1,5,8 *; | [A]WO2011028740 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * claims 1,5 *; | [A] - THOMAS HUNT ET AL, "Discovery of a novel chemotype of potent human ENaC blockers using a bioisostere approach. Part 1: Quaternary amines", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, PERGAMON, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 22, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.BMCL.2011.12.016, ISSN 0960-894X, (20111203), pages 929 - 932, (20111208), XP028438452 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2011.12.016 | [A] - THOMAS HUNT ET AL, "Discovery of a novel chemotype of potent human ENaC blockers using a bioisostere approach. Part 2: [alpha]-Branched quaternary amines", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (20120401), vol. 22, no. 8, doi:10.1016/j.bmcl.2012.02.067, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 2877 - 2879, XP055084884 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2012.02.067 |