EP3113835 - APPARATUS FOR TREATING THE HEART [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/02] | APPARATUS FOR TREATING A PATIENT HAVING A HEART | ||
[2018/34] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.09.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CardioLa Ltd. Gruezefeldstrasse 51 8404 Wintherthur / CH | [2017/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STANLEY, Glenn Schwärzen 33 CH-8185 Winkel / CH | [2017/02] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/12] | Manitz Finsterwald Patentanwälte PartmbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2017/02] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15713753.0 | 31.03.2015 | [2017/02] | WO2015EP57114 | Priority number, date | GB20140006483 | 10.04.2014 Original published format: GB 201406483 | [2017/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015155077 | Date: | 15.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3113835 | Date: | 11.01.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3113835 | Date: | 20.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/36, A61N1/04, A61N1/362, A61N1/365 | [2018/34] | CPC: |
A61N1/0452 (EP,US);
A61N1/36 (GB);
A61N1/0484 (US);
A61N1/36003 (EP,US);
A61N1/36014 (GB);
A61N1/36031 (EP,US);
A61N1/36034 (EP,US);
A61N1/36042 (EP,US);
A61N1/36135 (GB);
A61N1/36167 (GB);
A61N1/36171 (GB);
A61N1/3625 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/02] | A61N1/36, A61N1/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG DES HERZENS | [2018/34] | English: | APPARATUS FOR TREATING THE HEART | [2018/34] | French: | APPAREIL POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU COEUR | [2018/34] |
Former [2017/02] | APPARAT ZUR BEHANDLUNG EINES PATIENTEN MIT HERZ | ||
Former [2017/02] | APPARATUS FOR TREATING A PATIENT HAVING A HEART | ||
Former [2017/02] | APPAREIL POUR TRAITER UN PATIENT AYANT UN COEUR | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/02] | 05.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.02.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.03.2015 | AL | 20.03.2019 | CY | 20.03.2019 | CZ | 20.03.2019 | DK | 20.03.2019 | EE | 20.03.2019 | HR | 20.03.2019 | LT | 20.03.2019 | LV | 20.03.2019 | MC | 20.03.2019 | MK | 20.03.2019 | PL | 20.03.2019 | RO | 20.03.2019 | RS | 20.03.2019 | SI | 20.03.2019 | SK | 20.03.2019 | SM | 20.03.2019 | TR | 20.03.2019 | BE | 31.03.2019 | IE | 31.03.2019 | LU | 31.03.2019 | MT | 31.03.2019 | BG | 20.06.2019 | GR | 21.06.2019 | IS | 20.07.2019 | PT | 20.07.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 31.03.2015 | |
AL | 20.03.2019 | ||
CY | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
IE | 31.03.2019 | ||
LU | 31.03.2019 | ||
MT | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CY | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
IE | 31.03.2019 | ||
LU | 31.03.2019 | ||
MT | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
IE | 31.03.2019 | ||
LU | 31.03.2019 | ||
MT | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
IE | 31.03.2019 | ||
LU | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
IE | 31.03.2019 | ||
LU | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
IE | 31.03.2019 | ||
LU | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
LU | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
LU | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
LU | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | HR | 20.03.2019 | |
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HR | 20.03.2019 | |
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | LT | 20.03.2019 | |
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | LT | 20.03.2019 | |
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | LT | 20.03.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2617722 (SIMEON JEAN PASCAL [FR]) [A] 1-40* the whole document *; | [A]US6148233 (OWEN JAMES M [US], et al) [A] 1-40 * the whole document *; | [A]US2001014816 (HSU WILLIAM [US], et al) [A] 1-40 * the whole document *; | [A]US7158826 (KROLL MARK W [US], et al) [A] 1-40 * the whole document *; | [I]US2007198064 (LAPANASHVILI LARRY [CH], et al) [I] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US2007233194 (CRAIG ARTHUR D [US]) [A] 1-40 * the whole document *; | [I]US2008021504 (MCCABE AARON [US], et al) [I] 1 * the whole document *; | [I]US7340302 (FALKENBERG ERIC [US], et al) [I] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE602004009262T (CARDIOLA LTD [CH]) [A] 1-40 * the whole document *; | [I]US2014025136 (STUERZINGER CHRISTIAN [CH], et al) [I] 1-40 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0079] , [0082] , [0090] - [0092] - [0121] , [0153] * | by applicant | US6450942 | US6832982 | WO2006053596 | EP1694404 | EP1529550 | EP1078649 | US7941215 | US8032207 | EP2526998 | - A. KARAVIDAS, "Functional electrical stimulation of lower limbs in patients with chronic heart failure", HEART FAIL. REV., (2010), vol. 15, pages 563 - 579, XP019819331 | - A. R. WARD, "Electrical Stimulation Using Kilohertz-Frequency Alternating Current", PHYS. THER., (2009), vol. 89, doi:doi:10.2522/ptj.20080060, pages 181 - 190, XP055177663 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2522/ptj.20080060 | - BARBARA J MORGAN; JULIE E SHERRY; KRISTIN M OEHRLEIN; KRISTIN S HEGGE, "Effect of Burst-Mode Transcutaneous Electrical Nerve Stimulation on Peripheral Vascular Resistance", PHYS THER., (2001), vol. 81, pages 1183 - 1191 |