EP3123205 - NEUTRON DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 08.02.2023 [2023/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kromek Limited NetPark Incubator Thomas Wright Way Sedgefield, Durham TS21 3FD / GB | [2017/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARSDEN, Edward NETPark Thomas Wright Way Sedgefield Durham TS21 3FD / GB | [2017/05] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/05] | Wilson, Peter, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 15713801.7 | 27.03.2015 | [2017/05] | WO2015GB50921 | Priority number, date | GB20140005556 | 27.03.2014 Original published format: GB 201405556 | [2017/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015145164 | Date: | 01.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3123205 | Date: | 01.02.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01T3/06 | [2017/05] | CPC: |
G01T3/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/05] | Title | German: | NEUTRONENDETEKTION | [2017/05] | English: | NEUTRON DETECTION | [2017/05] | French: | DÉTECTION DE NEUTRONS | [2017/05] | Entry into regional phase | 10.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 10.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/05] | 10.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.09.2022 | 12.09.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 15.09.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/06] | 25.09.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2005103759 (FORIMTECH SA [CH], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6-8,13-16,20-22 * figures 1, 2 * * page 7, line 7 - line 11 * * page 8, line 10 - line 14 *; | [Y]US2006289775 (INBAR DAN [IL]) [Y] 18,19* paragraph [0075] *; | [Y]EP1847855 (ETH ZUERICH [CH]) [Y] 10,11 * paragraph [0030] *; | [X]US2009014662 (SUHAMI AVRAHAM [US]) [X] 1,4-9,16,17,20,22 * figures 1, 10 * * paragraphs [0134] - [0135] - [ 140] - [0141] - [ 179] , [ 196] - [0198] *; | [XY]US2010294943 (FRANK DAVID L [US]) [X] 1-3,12-15,20,21 * figure 4 * * paragraphs [0014] - [0015] - [0 24] - [0025] - [0 42] - [0044] * [Y] 18,19; | [XY]EP2256177 (TOKUYAMA CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6,13-15,20,21 * figures 27, 29 * * paragraphs [0066] , [ 144] - [0153] * [Y] 10,11; | [A]US2013234032 (WANG ZHIBIN [CN], et al) [A] 10,11 * paragraph [0047] * |