29.03.2024 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] |
23.03.2024 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
23.03.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
23.03.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
22.03.2024 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] |
05.01.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.12.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
24.11.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] |
24.11.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] |
20.10.2023 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
25.08.2023 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.04.2023 |
Issuance of search results under Rule 164(2) EPC together with a communication from the examining division |
published on 17.05.2023 [2023/20] |
14.04.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 17.05.2023 [2023/20] |
14.04.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 17.05.2023 [2023/20] |
13.01.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.01.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.11.2021 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
15.03.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.06.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
10.04.2020 |
First examination report |
|
08.04.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.03.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.03.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.06.2018 |
Change - applicant |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
16.03.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.08.2017 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] |
04.08.2017 |
Change - extension states |
published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] |
14.03.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.03.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.04.2017 [2017/14] |
03.03.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
03.03.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 05.04.2017 [2017/14] |
10.02.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
10.02.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.10.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.09.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.09.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
19.09.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
19.09.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.12.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.12.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.04.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|