EP3132269 - DIAGNOSIS OF CHRONIC KIDNEY DISEASE BY QUANTITATIVE ANALYSIS OF POST-TRANSLATIONAL MODIFICATIONS OF PLASMA PROTEINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.10.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.08.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states eXcorLab GmbH Industrie Center Obernburg WA07 Room 027 63784 Obernburg / DE | [2017/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEMKE, Horst-Dieter Dr.-Kittel-Weg 6 63785 Obernburg / DE | 02 /
RÜTH, Marieke Sonnenstr. 5 63785 Obernburg / DE | 03 /
JANKOWSKI, Joachim RWTH Aachen University University Hospital Pauwelsstrasse 30 52074 Aachen / DE | 04 /
JANKOWSKI, Vera RWTH Aachen University University Hospital Pauwelsstrasse 30 52074 Aachen / DE | [2017/10] |
Former [2017/08] | 01 /
LEMKE, Horst-Dieter Dr.-Kittel-Weg 6 63785 Obernburg / DE | ||
02 /
RÜTH, Marieke Sonnenstr. 5 63785 Obernburg / DE | |||
03 /
JANKOWSKI, Joachim Fasanenstr. 9c 14195 Stahnsdorf / DE | |||
04 /
JANKOWSKI, Vera Fasanenstr. 9c 14195 Stahnsdorf / DE | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2017/08] | Application number, filing date | 15714830.5 | 09.04.2015 | [2017/08] | WO2015EP57761 | Priority number, date | EP20140165189 | 17.04.2014 Original published format: EP 14165189 | [2017/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015158608 | Date: | 22.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3132269 | Date: | 22.02.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3132269 | Date: | 25.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68, C07K16/18 | [2017/08] | CPC: |
G01N33/6893 (EP,US);
C07K16/18 (US);
C07K2317/30 (US);
C07K2317/92 (US);
G01N2333/765 (US);
G01N2440/00 (US);
G01N2800/347 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIAGNOSE VON CHRONISCHER NIERENERKRANKUNG DURCH QUANTITATIVE ANALYSE VON POSTTRANSLATIONALEN MODIFIKATIONEN VON PLASMAPROTEINEN | [2017/08] | English: | DIAGNOSIS OF CHRONIC KIDNEY DISEASE BY QUANTITATIVE ANALYSIS OF POST-TRANSLATIONAL MODIFICATIONS OF PLASMA PROTEINS | [2017/08] | French: | DIAGNOSTIC D'UNE NÉPHROPATHIE CHRONIQUE PAR ANALYSE QUANTITATIVE DE MODIFICATIONS POST-TRANSLATIONNELLES DES PROTÉINES PLASMATIQUES | [2017/08] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/08] | 26.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 05.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.10.2019 | 10.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 18.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.04.2015 | AL | 25.12.2019 | AT | 25.12.2019 | CY | 25.12.2019 | CZ | 25.12.2019 | DK | 25.12.2019 | EE | 25.12.2019 | ES | 25.12.2019 | FI | 25.12.2019 | HR | 25.12.2019 | IT | 25.12.2019 | LT | 25.12.2019 | LV | 25.12.2019 | MC | 25.12.2019 | MK | 25.12.2019 | MT | 25.12.2019 | NL | 25.12.2019 | PL | 25.12.2019 | RO | 25.12.2019 | RS | 25.12.2019 | SE | 25.12.2019 | SI | 25.12.2019 | SK | 25.12.2019 | SM | 25.12.2019 | TR | 25.12.2019 | BG | 25.03.2020 | NO | 25.03.2020 | GR | 26.03.2020 | GB | 09.04.2020 | IE | 09.04.2020 | LU | 09.04.2020 | IS | 25.04.2020 | BE | 30.04.2020 | CH | 30.04.2020 | LI | 30.04.2020 | PT | 20.05.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 09.04.2015 | |
AL | 25.12.2019 | ||
AT | 25.12.2019 | ||
CY | 25.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
IT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
MT | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
PL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
TR | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
GB | 09.04.2020 | ||
IE | 09.04.2020 | ||
LU | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
AT | 25.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
IT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
PL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
GB | 09.04.2020 | ||
IE | 09.04.2020 | ||
LU | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
AT | 25.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
IT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
PL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IE | 09.04.2020 | ||
LU | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
AT | 25.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
IT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
PL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
LU | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
LU | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/52] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 25.12.2019 | |
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 25.12.2019 | |
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 25.12.2019 | |
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 25.03.2020 | Cited in | International search | [Y] - LUIZ CARLOS CICHOTA ET AL, "Evaluation of ischemia-modified albumin in anemia associated to chronic kidney disease", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL LABORATORY ANALYSIS, (20080101), vol. 22, no. 1, doi:10.1002/jcla.20226, ISSN 0887-8013, pages 1 - 5, XP055145337 [Y] 1-8,14-16 * page 2, column r, paragraph 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jcla.20226 | [XI] - CARLO DONADIO ET AL, "Albumin modification and fragmentation in renal disease", CLINICA CHIMICA ACTA, ELSEVIER BV, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 413, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.CCA.2011.11.009, ISSN 0009-8981, (20111109), pages 391 - 395, (20111119), XP028346603 [X] 1-12 * page 392, column r, paragraph 3 - page 394, column l, paragraph 1; figures 2,1 * [I] 13-16 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cca.2011.11.009 | [XYI] - AGARWAL R, "On the nature of proteinuria with acute renal injury in patients with chronic kidney disease", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PHYSIOLOGY - RENAL PHYSIOLOGY 200502 US, (200502), vol. 288, no. 2 57-2, ISSN 0363-6127, pages F265 - F271, XP002730893 [X] 9-12 * figures 5,6 * [Y] 1-8,14-16 [I] 13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1152/ajprenal.00318.2004 | [XI] - E. O. APOSTOLOV, "Quantification of Carbamylated LDL in Human Sera by a New Sandwich ELISA", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, (20050203), vol. 51, no. 4, doi:10.1373/clinchem.2004.044032, ISSN 0009-9147, pages 719 - 728, XP055156536 [X] 9 * abstract * [I] 13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1373/clinchem.2004.044032 | [XI] - EUGENE O. APOSTOLOV ET AL, "Carbamylated Low-Density Lipoprotein: Nontraditional Risk Factor for Cardiovascular Events in Patients With Chronic Kidney Disease", JOURNAL OF RENAL NUTRITION, Pubmed, (20120101), vol. 22, no. 1, doi:10.1053/j.jrn.2011.10.023, ISSN 1051-2276, pages 134 - 138, XP055156542 [X] 9 * abstract * [I] 13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1053/j.jrn.2011.10.023 | [XI] - CHEN HUANG-HAN ET AL, "Detection of total and A1c-glycosylated hemoglobin in human whole blood using sandwich immunoassays on polydimethylsiloxane-based antibody microarrays.", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY 16 OCT 2012, (20121016), vol. 84, no. 20, ISSN 1520-6882, pages 8635 - 8641, XP002733322 [X] 9,10 * abstract * [I] 13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac301756d | Examination | - HIGASHIMOTO Y ET AL, "Human p53 is phosphorylated on serines 6 and 9 in response to DNA damage-inducing agents", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, US, (20000728), vol. 275, no. 30, doi:10.1074/JBC.M002674200, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 23199 - 23203, XP002303535 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M002674200 | - SMITH W G J ET AL, "Carbamylated haemoglobin in chronic renal failure", CLINICA CHIMICA ACTA, ELSEVIER BV, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 178, no. 3, doi:10.1016/0009-8981(88)90238-0, ISSN 0009-8981, (19881230), pages 297 - 303, (19881230), XP023399657 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0009-8981(88)90238-0 | - MEANS G E ET AL, "CHEMICAL MODIFICATIONS OF PROTEINS: HISTORY AND APPLICATIONS", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (19900101), vol. 1, no. 1, doi:10.1021/BC00001A001, ISSN 1043-1802, pages 2 - 12, XP000236570 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc00001a001 | - Joe T Kimmel, "Guanidination of Proteins", Methods in Enzymology, Elsevier, (19671231), pages 584 - 589, doi:https://doi.org/10.1016/S0076-6879(67)11072-0, XP055482517 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/https://doi.org/10.1016/S0076-6879(67)11072-0 | by applicant | US4816567 | - HALLAN S.I. ET AL., JAMA, (2012), vol. 308, pages 2349 - 2360 | - SUN Y.M. ET AL., BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMMUN., (2013), vol. 433, pages 359 - 361 | - PRAKASH M ET AL., INDIAN J NEPHROL., (2010), vol. 20, pages 9 - 14 | - ZAGER R.A ET AL., AM J PHYSIOL RENAL PHYSIOL., (2006), vol. 291, pages F546 - 556 | - WANG, NATURE MEDICINE, (2007), vol. 13, pages 1176 - 84 | - GAIKWAD A.B. ET AL., AM J PATHOL., (2010), vol. 176, pages 1079 - 1083 | - HAN, AM. J. KIDNEY. DIS., (1997), vol. 30, pages 36 - 40 | - KAIRAITIS ET AL., NEPHROL. DIAL. TRANSPLANT, (2000), vol. 15, pages 1431 - 7 | - APOSTOLOV ET AL., JASN, (2010), vol. 21, pages 1852 - 7 | - APOSTOLOV ET AL., J. RENAL. NUTR., (2012), vol. 22, pages 134 - 8 | - SHAKLAI N. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1984), vol. 259, pages 3812 - 3817 | - HANSEN, H.P. ET AL., KIDNEY INTERNATIONAL, (2002), vol. 61, pages 163 - 168 | - CARTER ET AL., ADV PROTEIN CHEM., (1994), vol. 45, pages 153 - 203 | - DEEB ET AL., BIOPOLYMERS, (2011), vol. 93, pages 161 - 170 | - FANALI ET AL., MOL ASPECTS MED., (2012), vol. 33, pages 209 - 290 | - MAHMOODI ET AL., LANCET, (2012), vol. 380, pages 1649 - 1661 | - WADA ET AL., CLIN EXP NEPHROL., (2012), vol. 16, pages 96 - 101 | - LIM ET AL., NEPHROLOGY (CARLTON), (2007), vol. 12, pages 18 - 24 | - GEKLE, J AM SOC NEPHROL., (1998), vol. 9, pages 960 - 968 | - MACCONI ET AL., J AM SOC NEPHROL., (2009), vol. 20, pages 123 - 130 | - CESSAC ET AL., MECH AGEING DEV., (1993), vol. 70, pages 139 - 148 | - WATANABE ET AL., DRUG METAB DISPOS., (2012), vol. 40, pages 1423 - 1428 | - KLAMMT ET AL., NEPHROL DIAL TRANSPLANT., (2012), vol. 27, pages 2377 - 2383 | - LORENZO SELLARES ET AL., NEFROLOGIA, (2008), vol. 28, no. 3, pages 67 - 78 | - OETTL; STAUBER, BR J PHARMACOL., (2007), vol. 151, pages 580 - 590 | - LEVEY ET AL., KIDNEY INTERNATIONAL, (2011), vol. 80, pages 17 - 28 | - "KDIGO 2012 Clinical Practice Guideline for the Evaluation and Management of Chronic Kidney Disease", KIDNEY INT SUPPL, (2013), vol. 3, pages 1 - 150 | - STEVENS ET AL., N ENGL J MED., (20060608), vol. 354, no. 23, pages 2473 - 83 | - DE JONG; CURHAN, J AM SOC NEPHROL, (2006), vol. 17, pages 2120 - 2126 | - KRAGH-HANSEN ET AL., EUR J BIOCHEM, (19901005), vol. 193, no. 1, pages 169 - 74 | - ROZMAN, J MASS SPECTROM., (2011), vol. 46, pages 949 - 955 | - KOHLER ET AL., NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, page 495 | - CLACKSON ET AL., NATURE, (1991), vol. 352, pages 624 - 628 | - MARKS ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 222, pages 581 - 597 | - "Methods in Molecular Biology", JOHN R. CROWTHER, The ELISA Guidebook, HUMANA PRESS, (2000), vol. 149 | - IRIKURA ET AL., CHEM PHARM BULL (TOKYO), (1991), vol. 39, pages 724 - 728 | - KRAGH-HANSEN, 1 BIOCHEM J., (1991), vol. 273, pages 641 - 644 | - SARNATSKAYA ET AL., BIOCHEM PHARMACOL., (2002), vol. 63, pages 1287 - 1296 | - LAEMMLI, NATURE, (1970), vol. 227, pages 680 - 685 | - KIMMEL, METH. ENZYMOLOGY, (1967), page 584 |