EP3128859 - NUTRITIONAL SUPPLEMENT POWDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.08.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abbott Laboratories Department 377 - AP6A-1 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park North Chicago, IL 60064 / US | [2017/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUPTA, Rockendra 3910 Charter Oak Way Columbus, Ohio 43219 / US | 02 /
PATEL, Gaurav 623 Crossing Creek S Gahanna, Ohio 43230 / US | 03 /
DEWILLE, Normanella 2580 Clairmont Court Columbus, Ohio 43220 / US | [2017/07] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/07] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 15715057.4 | 23.03.2015 | [2017/07] | WO2015US22025 | Priority number, date | US201461970509P | 26.03.2014 Original published format: US 201461970509 P | [2017/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015148384 | Date: | 01.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3128859 | Date: | 15.02.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A23L33/10, A23L33/15, A23L33/16, A23L33/17, A23L33/21, A23L33/00 | [2017/07] | CPC: |
A23L33/21 (EP,US);
A23L33/12 (EP,US);
A23L33/15 (EP,US);
A23L33/16 (EP,US);
A23L33/17 (EP,US);
A23L33/18 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/30, A23V2250/1578, A23V2250/161, A23V2250/1618, A23V2250/1626, A23V2250/1586, A23V2250/1582, A23V2250/1608, A23V2250/1612, A23V2250/1868, A23V2250/187, A23V2250/1872, A23V2250/1874, A23V2250/1862, A23V2250/702, A23V2250/71, A23V2250/712, A23V2250/7042, A23V2250/7046, A23V2250/7052, A23V2250/706, A23V2250/5114, A23V2250/5062, A23V2250/5068 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/07] | Title | German: | NÄHRSTOFFERGÄNZUNGSPULVER | [2017/07] | English: | NUTRITIONAL SUPPLEMENT POWDER | [2017/07] | French: | POUDRE DE COMPLÉMENT NUTRITIONNEL | [2017/07] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/07] | 23.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/38] | 13.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9731546 (NUTRI PHARMA AS [GB], et al) [A] 1-35* the whole document *; | [A]WO2005013721 (NESTEC SA [CH], et al) [A] 1-35 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2007039596 (NESTEC SA [CH], et al) [A] 1-35 * the whole document *; | [XI]CN101317684 (WENBIAO ZHANG [CN]) [X] 1,7,14,16,21,26,32-35 * example 4 * [I] 2-6,8-13,15,17-20,22-25,27-31; | [A]WO2012143402 (NESTEC SA [CH], et al) [A] 1-35 * the whole document * |