EP3123580 - CRADLE CLAMP BRACKET ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.09.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.03.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.02.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.10.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.07.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panduit Corp. 18900 Panduit Drive Tinley Park, IL 60487 / US | [2017/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SYLVESTER, David J. 101 Sandy Ridge Drive Steger, Illinois 60475 / US | 02 /
ROULEAU, Rodney G. 304 Andrea Drive Manhattan, Illinois 60442 / US | 03 /
HILL, Raymond M. 24916 West Michele Drive Plainfield, Illinois 60544 / US | 04 /
CROUSE, Andrew 360 Falconridge Way Bolingbrook, Illinois 60440 / US | [2017/05] | Representative(s) | Harden, Henry Simon, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2023/12] |
Former [2017/05] | Harden, Henry Simon, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15715564.9 | 23.03.2015 | [2017/05] | WO2015US21937 | Priority number, date | US201461970143P | 25.03.2014 Original published format: US 201461970143 P | US201514664278 | 20.03.2015 Original published format: US201514664278 | [2017/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015148345 | Date: | 01.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3123580 | Date: | 01.02.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3123580 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/32, H02G3/04, H02G3/00 | [2017/05] | CPC: |
H02G3/32 (EP,KR,US);
H02G3/0456 (EP,CN,KR,US);
E06C7/14 (KR,US);
E06C7/48 (KR,US);
F16B2/065 (US);
F16C3/26 (KR,US);
F16L3/1211 (KR,US);
F16L3/137 (US);
F16L3/223 (KR);
F16L3/233 (US);
F16L3/24 (KR);
F16M13/022 (US);
H02G3/263 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WIEGENKLEMMHALTERUNGSANORDNUNG | [2017/05] | English: | CRADLE CLAMP BRACKET ASSEMBLY | [2017/05] | French: | ENSEMBLE SUPPORT D'ATTACHE DE BERCEAU | [2017/05] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/05] | 24.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 29.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18150152.9 / EP3324502 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.03.2023 | CZ | 22.03.2023 | DK | 22.03.2023 | EE | 22.03.2023 | ES | 22.03.2023 | FI | 22.03.2023 | HR | 22.03.2023 | IT | 22.03.2023 | LT | 22.03.2023 | LV | 22.03.2023 | MC | 22.03.2023 | NL | 22.03.2023 | PL | 22.03.2023 | RO | 22.03.2023 | RS | 22.03.2023 | SE | 22.03.2023 | SI | 22.03.2023 | SK | 22.03.2023 | SM | 22.03.2023 | IE | 23.03.2023 | LU | 23.03.2023 | BE | 31.03.2023 | CH | 31.03.2023 | LI | 31.03.2023 | NO | 22.06.2023 | GR | 23.06.2023 | IS | 22.07.2023 | PT | 24.07.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/10] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
CZ | 22.03.2023 | ||
DK | 22.03.2023 | ||
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
MC | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SI | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
IE | 23.03.2023 | ||
LU | 23.03.2023 | ||
BE | 31.03.2023 | ||
CH | 31.03.2023 | ||
LI | 31.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
CZ | 22.03.2023 | ||
DK | 22.03.2023 | ||
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
MC | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
IE | 23.03.2023 | ||
LU | 23.03.2023 | ||
CH | 31.03.2023 | ||
LI | 31.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
MC | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
IE | 23.03.2023 | ||
LU | 23.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/02] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
LU | 23.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 22.03.2023 | |
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | FI | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 22.03.2023 | |
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 22.03.2023 | |
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 22.03.2023 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5560576 (CARGILL LEE B [US]) [Y] 3 * figure 3 *; | [A]US2008264688 (CHOPP JOSEPH A [US], et al) [A] 1-3* figures 3-5 *; | [XY] - "Panduit Quicklock Ladder Rack Bracket", (20000511), URL: http://www.panduit.com/heiler/PartDrawings/FR6LRB.pdf, (20150602), XP055193060 [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [Y] 3,17,18 | [XAY] - "Panduit Ladder Bracket", (20011109), URL: http://www.panduit.com/heiler/PartDrawings/F2PCLB58.pdf, (20150602), XP055193097 [X] 10-13,15 * the whole document * [A] 1,2 [Y] 17,18 | Examination | US2345650 | US5687941 | AU2011202448 |