EP3129785 - DIAGNOSIS OF CANCER BY DETECTING DIMERIC IL-18 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.09.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.07.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Randox Laboratories Ltd. Ardmore, Diamond Road Crumlin Co. Antrim, Northern Ireland BT29 4QY / GB | [2017/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHACKO, Alex Randox Laboratories Ltd Ardmore Diamond Road Co Antrim Northern Ireland BT29 4QY / GB | 02 /
MCCONNELL, Ivan Randox Laboratories Ltd Ardmore Diamond Road Crumlin Co Antrim Northern Ireland BT29 4QY / GB | 03 /
FITZGERALD, Peter Randox Laboratories Ltd Ardmore Diamond Road Co Antrim Northern Ireland BT29 4QY / GB | 04 /
LAMONT, John V. Randox Laboratories Ltd. Ardmore 55 Diamond Road Crumlin Co. Antrim Northern Ireland BT29 4QY / GB | [2017/07] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2017/07] | Application number, filing date | 15715807.2 | 02.04.2015 | [2017/07] | WO2015GB51052 | Priority number, date | GB20140006398 | 09.04.2014 Original published format: GB 201406398 | GB20150001415 | 28.01.2015 Original published format: GB 201501415 | [2017/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015155513 | Date: | 15.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3129785 | Date: | 15.02.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3129785 | Date: | 27.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/574 | [2017/07] | CPC: |
G01N33/57484 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
A61P35/04 (EP,US);
G01N33/53 (US);
G01N33/57423 (US);
G01N33/6869 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KREBSDIAGNOSE DURCH DEN NACHWEIS VON DIMEREM IL-18 | [2018/34] | English: | DIAGNOSIS OF CANCER BY DETECTING DIMERIC IL-18 | [2017/07] | French: | DIAGNOSE DU CANCER PAR LA DÉTECTION DE IL-18 DIMERIQUE | [2018/34] |
Former [2017/07] | DIAGNOSE VON KREBS DURCH NACHWEIS VON DIMEREM IL-18 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DIAGNOSTIC DU CANCER PAR DÉTECTION D'IL-18 DIMÉRIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 10.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 10.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/07] | 10.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.01.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.04.2015 | AL | 27.02.2019 | AT | 27.02.2019 | CY | 27.02.2019 | CZ | 27.02.2019 | DK | 27.02.2019 | EE | 27.02.2019 | ES | 27.02.2019 | FI | 27.02.2019 | HR | 27.02.2019 | IT | 27.02.2019 | LT | 27.02.2019 | LV | 27.02.2019 | MC | 27.02.2019 | MK | 27.02.2019 | MT | 27.02.2019 | NL | 27.02.2019 | PL | 27.02.2019 | RO | 27.02.2019 | RS | 27.02.2019 | SE | 27.02.2019 | SI | 27.02.2019 | SK | 27.02.2019 | SM | 27.02.2019 | TR | 27.02.2019 | LU | 02.04.2019 | FR | 27.04.2019 | BE | 30.04.2019 | CH | 30.04.2019 | LI | 30.04.2019 | BG | 27.05.2019 | NO | 27.05.2019 | GR | 28.05.2019 | IS | 27.06.2019 | PT | 27.06.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 02.04.2015 | |
AL | 27.02.2019 | ||
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CY | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
MT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LU | 02.04.2019 | ||
FR | 27.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 02.04.2015 | |
AL | 27.02.2019 | ||
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CY | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LU | 02.04.2019 | ||
FR | 27.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CY | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LU | 02.04.2019 | ||
FR | 27.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LU | 02.04.2019 | ||
FR | 27.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
LU | 02.04.2019 | ||
FR | 27.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
LU | 02.04.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 27.02.2019 | |
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 27.02.2019 | |
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XI] - SEYA T ET AL, "Protein polymorphism of human IL-18 identified by monoclonal antibodies", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR MEDICINE, SPANDIDOS PUBLICATIONS, GR, vol. 8, no. 5, doi:10.3892/IJMM.8.5.585, ISSN 1107-3756, (20011101), pages 585 - 590, (20111001), XP008176540 [X] 1-3,29-37 * abstract * * page 587 - page 588 * [I] 4-12,39,40 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3892/ijmm.8.5.585 | [XI] - T SEYA ET AL, "114: Novel proforms of IL-18 are produced in human Langerhans cells, macrophages and mature dendritic cells but not monocytes", THE JOURNAL OF INVESTIGATIVE DERMATOLOGY, GB, (20000101), vol. 114, no. 1, doi:10.1046/j.1523-1747.2000.01141.x, ISSN 0022-202X, page 228, XP055193462 [X] 1-3,29-37 * abstract * [I] 4-12,39,40 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1523-1747.2000.01141.x | [X] - KIKKAWA S ET AL, "A COMPARATIVE ANALYSIS OF THE ANTIGENIC, STRUCTURAL, AND FUNCTIONAL PROPERTIES OF THREE DIFFERENT PREPARATIONS OF RECOMBINANT HUMAN INTERLEUKIN-18", JOURNAL OF INTERFERON AND CYTOKINE RESEARCH, MARY ANN LIEBERT, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20000201), vol. 20, no. 2, doi:10.1089/107999000312586, ISSN 1079-9907, pages 179 - 185, XP001008267 [X] 32-36 * abstract * * page 180 - page 181; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/107999000312586 | [X] - SATOMI KIKKAWA ET AL, "Human Macrophages Produce Dimeric Forms of IL-18 Which Can Be Detected with Monoclonal Antibodies Specific for Inactive IL-18", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (20010201), vol. 281, no. 2, doi:10.1006/bbrc.2001.4378, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 461 - 467, XP055193673 [X] 32-36 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.2001.4378 | [X] - K SHIDA ET AL, "High serum levels of additional IL-18 forms may be reciprocally correlated with IgE levels in patients with atopic dermatitis", IMMUNOLOGY LETTERS, (20011203), vol. 79, no. 3, doi:10.1016/S0165-2478(01)00290-5, ISSN 0165-2478, pages 169 - 175, XP055193675 [X] 32-36 * abstract * * page 170 - page 171 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0165-2478(01)00290-5 | [X] - K. SHIDA ET AL, "An Alternative Form of IL-18 in Human Blood Plasma: Complex Formation with IgM Defined by Monoclonal Antibodies", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (20010601), vol. 166, no. 11, doi:10.4049/jimmunol.166.11.6671, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 6671 - 6679, XP055193677 [X] 32-36 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4049/jimmunol.166.11.6671 | [I] - Masaki Okamoto ET AL, "Correlation of Decreased Survival and IL-18 in Bone Metastasis", Internal Medicine, Japan, doi:10.2169/internalmedicine.48.1851, (20090515), pages 763 - 773, URL: http://jlc.jst.go.jp/JST.JSTAGE/internalmedicine/48.1851?from=SUMMON, (20150604), XP055193683 [I] 1-40 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2169/internalmedicine.48.1851 | [I] - CARBONE ANNA ET AL, "IL-18 Paradox in Pancreatic Carcinoma: Elevated Serum Levels of Free IL-18 are Correlated With Poor Survival", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOTHERAPY, (200911), vol. 32, no. 9, ISSN 1524-9557, pages 920 - 931, XP008176543 [I] 1-40 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/CJI.0b013e3181b29168 | [I] - Shailendra Dwivedi et al, "Diagnostic and Prognostic Significance of Prostate Specific Antigen and Serum Interleukin 18 and 10 in Patients with Locally Advanced Prostate Cancer: A Prospective Study", Asian Pacific Journal of Cancer Prevention J Cancer Prev, vol. 12, no. 7, (20110101), pages 1843 - 1848, URL: http://www.apocpcontrol.org/paper_file/issue_abs/Volume12_No7/1843-1848 c 6.27 Shailendra Dwivedi.pdf, (20150604), XP055193692 [I] 1-40 * abstract * |