EP3113646 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING COSMETIC PRODUCT CAPSULES, SPECIFICALLY LIPSTICKS, AND RELATING MANUFACTURING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.09.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Patent Lab SA Via Bossi, 23 6830 Chiasso / CH | [2020/19] |
Former [2019/09] | For all designated states Patent Lab SA Via Bossi, 23 6830 Chiasso / CH | ||
Former [2017/02] | For all designated states PATENT LAB SAGL Via Bossi, 23 6830 Chiasso / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAVERIO, Sergio c/o Patent Lab SA Via Bossi 23 6830 Chiasso / CH | [2020/19] |
Former [2017/02] | 01 /
FAVERIO, Sergio c/o PATENT LAB SAGL Via Bossi 23 CH-6830 Chiasso / CH | Representative(s) | Robba, Pierpaolo, et al Interpatent S.R.L. Via Caboto, 35 10129 Torino / IT | [2020/19] |
Former [2017/02] | Fabiano, Piero Fabiano, Franke & MGT Sagl Riva Caccia 1D 6900 Lugano / CH | Application number, filing date | 15715829.6 | 05.03.2015 | [2017/02] | WO2015IB51610 | Priority number, date | IT2014RM00107 | 06.03.2014 Original published format: IT RM20140107 | [2017/02] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015132750 | Date: | 11.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3113646 | Date: | 11.01.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3113646 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A45D40/16 | [2017/02] | CPC: |
A45D40/16 (EP,US);
B65B3/04 (US);
B65B51/10 (US);
B65B63/08 (US);
B65B7/28 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON KOSMETISCHEN PRODUKTKAPSELN, INSBESONDERE LIPPENSTIFT, UND ZUGEHÖRIGE HERSTELLUNGSMASCHINE | [2017/02] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING COSMETIC PRODUCT CAPSULES, SPECIFICALLY LIPSTICKS, AND RELATING MANUFACTURING MACHINE | [2017/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CAPSULES DE PRODUIT COSMÉTIQUE, EN PARTICULIER DES BÂTONS DE ROUGE À LÈVRES, ET MACHINE DE FABRICATION ASSOCIÉE | [2017/02] | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 04.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.2016 | Examination requested [2017/02] | 04.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.03.2015 | AL | 06.05.2020 | AT | 06.05.2020 | CY | 06.05.2020 | CZ | 06.05.2020 | DK | 06.05.2020 | EE | 06.05.2020 | ES | 06.05.2020 | FI | 06.05.2020 | HR | 06.05.2020 | LT | 06.05.2020 | LV | 06.05.2020 | MC | 06.05.2020 | MK | 06.05.2020 | MT | 06.05.2020 | NL | 06.05.2020 | PL | 06.05.2020 | RO | 06.05.2020 | RS | 06.05.2020 | SE | 06.05.2020 | SI | 06.05.2020 | SK | 06.05.2020 | SM | 06.05.2020 | TR | 06.05.2020 | BG | 06.08.2020 | NO | 06.08.2020 | GR | 07.08.2020 | IS | 06.09.2020 | PT | 07.09.2020 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 05.03.2015 | |
AL | 06.05.2020 | ||
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CY | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
MK | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
TR | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 05.03.2015 | |
AL | 06.05.2020 | ||
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CY | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
MK | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 05.03.2015 | |
AL | 06.05.2020 | ||
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CY | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 05.03.2015 | |
AL | 06.05.2020 | ||
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 06.05.2020 | |
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 06.09.2020 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0418841 (BINNEY & SMITH INC [US]) [X] 1-10,14 * abstract * * page 2, column 1, lines 3-10 - page 3, column 3, lines 20-22 * * page 3, column 4, lines 24-30,37-58 - page 6, lines 8-14 *; | [X]US5316712 (ONO ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [X] 2-4,6-10 * abstract * * column 1, lines 1-5 - column 3, lines 9-40 * * column 4, lines 25-30 - column 5, lines 36-68 *; | [A]US2006283727 (NELSON DONAVON [US], et al) [A] 1* paragraphs [0064] , [0095] *; | [I]EP1813335 (OREAL [FR]) [I] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0058] *; | [X]US2012009135 (MISNER STEVE [US], et al) [X] 2-4,6-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0100] - [0105] * |