EP3120265 - A METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING A MEASURE OF OVERLAP BETWEEN DATA ENTRIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Synerscope BV Kastanjelaan 14 5268 CA Helvoirt / NL | [2017/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLAAS, Jorik c/o Horsten 1 NL-5612 AX Eindhoven / NL | [2017/04] | Representative(s) | Harris, Oliver John Richard Novagraaf UK Centrum Norwich Research Park Colney Lane Norwich NR4 7UG / GB | [2017/04] | Application number, filing date | 15716161.3 | 16.03.2015 | [2017/04] | WO2015NL50165 | Priority number, date | US201414215292 | 17.03.2014 Original published format: US201414215292 | [2017/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015142169 | Date: | 24.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3120265 | Date: | 25.01.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2017/04] | CPC: |
G06Q10/10 (EP,US);
G06F16/2255 (US);
G06F16/2228 (EP,US);
G06F16/2237 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/04] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINES MASSES DER ÜBERLAPPUNG ZWISCHEN DATENEINGABEN | [2017/04] | English: | A METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING A MEASURE OF OVERLAP BETWEEN DATA ENTRIES | [2017/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR DÉTERMINER UNE MESURE DE CHEVAUCHEMENT ENTRE DES ENTRÉES DE DONNÉES | [2017/04] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/04] | 22.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.08.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.10.2020 | 07.10.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 23.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/11] | 02.11.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/11] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 08.11.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 08.11.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.11.2019 | Decision despatched | 22.08.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 22.08.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.09.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.09.2017 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I] - Anonymous, "Database - Wikipedia, the free encyclopedia", (20140315), pages 1 - 20, URL: http://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Database&oldid=599688923, (20150518), XP055189686 [I] 1-28 * the whole document * | Examination | US2007239663 | - Raxit Sheth ET AL, "geohashing - geohash string length and accuracy - Stack Overflow", (20130511), pages 1 - 2, URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20130511203445/https://stackoverflow.com/questions/13448595/geohash-string-length-and-accuracy, (20190116), XP055543188 |