EP3127259 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING OUTDOOR UNIT CONNECTED WITH AN INTEGRATED RECEIVER DECODER USING A SINGLE CABLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.10.2020 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.10.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gt-sat International S.à R.l. 16 Rue Millewée 7257 Helmsange / LU | [2017/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEDIOUNI, Asher Gil 18 Avenue Grand-Duc Jean 1842 Howald / LU | [2017/06] | Representative(s) | Office Freylinger P.O. Box 48 8001 Strassen / LU | [2017/06] | Application number, filing date | 15716460.9 | 31.03.2015 | [2017/06] | WO2015EP57107 | Priority number, date | LU20140092417 | 01.04.2014 Original published format: LU 92417 | [2017/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015150422 | Date: | 08.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3127259 | Date: | 08.02.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3127259 | Date: | 25.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04H40/90 | [2017/06] | CPC: |
H04H40/90 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM STEUERN EINER AUSSENEINHEIT DIE MIT EINEM EINZIGEN KABEL MIT EINEM INTEGRIERTEN EMPFÄNGERDECODER VERBUNDEN IST | [2019/32] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING OUTDOOR UNIT CONNECTED WITH AN INTEGRATED RECEIVER DECODER USING A SINGLE CABLE | [2017/06] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR CONTROLLER UNE UNITÉ EXTÉRIEURE QUI EST RELIÉE À UN DECODEUR RÉCEPTEUR INTÉGRÉ À TRAVERS UN CÂBLE UNIQUE | [2019/32] |
Former [2017/06] | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DER AUSSENEINHEIT MIT ANSCHLUSS AN EINEN INTEGRIERTEN EMPFÄNGERDECODER MIT EINEM EINZIGEN KABEL | ||
Former [2017/06] | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UNE UNITÉ EXTÉRIEURE CONNECTÉE À UN RÉCEPTEUR-DÉCODEUR INTÉGRÉ À L'AIDE D'UN SEUL CÂBLE | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/06] | 28.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.03.2015 | AL | 25.12.2019 | AT | 25.12.2019 | CY | 25.12.2019 | CZ | 25.12.2019 | DK | 25.12.2019 | EE | 25.12.2019 | ES | 25.12.2019 | FI | 25.12.2019 | HR | 25.12.2019 | LT | 25.12.2019 | LV | 25.12.2019 | MC | 25.12.2019 | MK | 25.12.2019 | MT | 25.12.2019 | NL | 25.12.2019 | PL | 25.12.2019 | RO | 25.12.2019 | RS | 25.12.2019 | SI | 25.12.2019 | SK | 25.12.2019 | SM | 25.12.2019 | TR | 25.12.2019 | BG | 25.03.2020 | NO | 25.03.2020 | GR | 26.03.2020 | IS | 25.04.2020 | PT | 20.05.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 31.03.2015 | |
AL | 25.12.2019 | ||
AT | 25.12.2019 | ||
CY | 25.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
MT | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
PL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
TR | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
AT | 25.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
PL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 25.12.2019 | |
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 25.12.2019 | |
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 25.12.2019 | |
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 25.03.2020 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9839707 (ETHOS SOFTWARE CORP [US], et al) [Y] 7 * page 6, line 3 - page 7, line 1 *; | [A]US2004229562 (WREN CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) [A] 7,10,13 * paragraph [0011] *; | [Y]WO2010086884 (SKY ITALIA S R L [IT], et al) [Y] 1,3-5,8,10-15 * page 1, line 11 - page 2, line 1 * * page 7, line 4 - line 9 * * page 9, line 1 - line 17 * * page 10, line 4 - line 18 * * page 11, line 6 - line 10 *; | [A]US2011016496 (POPA OVIDIU OCTAVIAN [CA], et al) [A] 5,9 * paragraphs [0028] , [ 0032] , [ 0039] , [ 0049]; claim 11 *; | [A]US2012264365 (WONG PETER [US], et al) [A] 3,4 * paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0066] *; | [YP]EP2852078 (ECHOSTAR TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US]) [YP] 7,10-15 * paragraph [0003] *; | [YD] - "EN 50494:2007 Signalverteilung von Satellitensignalen über ein einziges koaxiales Kabelverteilnetz; Deutsche Fassung EN 50494:2007", DIN EN. EUROPEAN STANDARD. EUROPAEISCHE NORM. VDE, DIN. DEUTSCHES INSTITUT FÜR NORMUNG E.V, DE, (20080201), vol. EN 50494:2007, pages 1 - 32, XP008173345 [YD] 1,3-5,8,10-15 * paragraph [004.] * * paragraph [6.2.1.] - paragraph [6.2.2.] * * paragraph [6.3.] * * paragraph [6.3.4.] * * paragraph [7.3.] * | [ADP] - "NEN-EN 50607:2014 Ontw. en Satelietsignaal distributie over een enkele coaxiale kabel - Tweede generatie - [Satellite signal distribution over a single coaxial cable - Second generation]", vol. 50607:2014, (20140401), pages 1 - 30, NEN, NORMALISATIE EN NORMEN NEN, NEN, NL, URL: http://www.nen.nl/NEN-Shop/Norm/NENEN-506072014-Ontw.-en.htm, (20141121), XP008173544 [ADP] 7,10,13 * sentence 337 - sentence 338 * | by applicant | WO2010086884 |