EP3132169 - VALVE WITH EASY ASSEMBLY OF A COUPLING IN A CAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.11.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.12.2017 [2017/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Systèmes de Contrôle Moteur Propriété Intellectuelle 14 avenue des Béguines 95800 Cergy Saint Christophe / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/08] | For all designated states Valeo Systèmes De Contrôle Moteur Propriété Intellectuelle 14 avenue des Béguines 95800 Cergy Saint Christophe / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIBERA, Frédéric 25 Rue Georges Bourgoin Bat. 4 F-78260 Acheres / FR | 02 /
GAUTIER, Sylvain 11 Rue du Pré F-95300 Ennery / FR | [2017/08] | Representative(s) | Garcia, Christine Propriété Intellectuelle Valeo Systèmes de Contrôle Moteur 14, avenue des Béguines 95800 Cergy St Christophe / FR | [2017/08] | Application number, filing date | 15717049.9 | 31.03.2015 | [2017/08] | WO2015FR50832 | Priority number, date | FR20140052884 | 01.04.2014 Original published format: FR 1452884 | [2017/08] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015150692 | Date: | 08.10.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3132169 | Date: | 22.02.2017 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F16K31/528, F02D11/10, F16K31/04, F16K31/524, F02M25/00 | [2017/08] | CPC: |
F16K31/528 (EP);
F02M26/54 (EP);
F02M26/58 (EP);
F02M26/66 (EP);
F16K31/047 (EP);
F16K31/52408 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/08] | Title | German: | VENTIL MIT EINFACHER MONTAGE EINER KUPPLUNG IN EINER NOCKE | [2017/08] | English: | VALVE WITH EASY ASSEMBLY OF A COUPLING IN A CAM | [2017/08] | French: | VANNE À MONTAGE FACILITÉ D'UN ATTELAGE DANS UNE CAME | [2017/08] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/08] | 04.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/50] | 20.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2017/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]FR2947026 (VALEO SYS CONTROLE MOTEUR SAS [FR]) [X] 1-5 * page 4, line 3 - page 8, line 31; figure - * [A] 9 [I] 6-8; | [XAI]WO2010146121 (VALEO SYS CONTROLE MOTEUR SAS [FR]; ALBERT LAURENT [FR]; RIDOLFI GABRI) [X] 1 * page 4, line 11 - page 8, line 9; figure - * [A] 9 [I] 2-8; | [A]GB1001629 (ROTORK ENG CO LTD) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1342907 (PIERBURG GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | by applicant | FR2914975 | FR2947027 |