|
19.04.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2024 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
19.04.2024 |
Description |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
19.04.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2024 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.12.2023 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2023 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.03.2023 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2023 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.09.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
02.09.2022 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
02.09.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.2022 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.07.2022 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.07.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2022 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2022 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.03.2022 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.05.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.05.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.05.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.03.2020 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.03.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2020 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
20.11.2019 |
Communication from Examining division including search results r.164(2)(b) EPC |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.11.2019 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2019 |
Search results under rule 164(2)(b) EPC |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.11.2019 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.08.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
29.08.2019 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
29.08.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
29.08.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.08.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
26.06.2019 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
21.06.2019 |
Communication from the examining division with an Invitation to pay a search fee(s) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.06.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2019 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2019 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2017 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.07.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.07.2017 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.07.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
45 |
|
15.03.2017 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2017 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.01.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2017 |
Priority search results copy provided by EPO |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
19.12.2016 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
13.12.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
13.12.2016 |
Claims filed under Art.19 PCT |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
13.12.2016 |
Claims filed under Art.19 PCT |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
13.12.2016 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
13.12.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2016 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.12.2016 |
Statement under Art. 19 PCT |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2016 |
Statement under Art. 19 PCT |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2016 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.08.2016 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
16.08.2016 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2016 |
Published international application - A4 |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
10.12.2015 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
10.12.2015 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
43 |
|
02.11.2015 |
Notification of decision on protest |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
02.11.2015 |
Separate sheet |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
30.10.2015 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
30.10.2015 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
30.10.2015 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
11 |
|
10.08.2015 |
Reply to invitation to pay additional fees |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
07.05.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
07.05.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
09.04.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
09.04.2015 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
09.04.2015 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
9 |
|
09.04.2015 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
29 |
|
09.04.2015 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
3 |
|
09.04.2015 |
Priority document (RO-procedure) |
PCT receiving Office |
44 |