29.04.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.04.2024 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
21.12.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.04.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.03.2023 |
Change - representative |
|
03.09.2022 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
06.07.2022 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
29.04.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.03.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.04.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.05.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
31.03.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.03.2020 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.11.2019 |
Issuance of search results under Rule 164(2) EPC together with a communication from the examining division |
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] |
22.11.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] |
22.11.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] |
22.11.2019 |
First examination report |
|
16.11.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.05.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.05.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.08.2017 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] |
28.07.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
04.05.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.03.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 12.04.2017 [2017/15] |
10.03.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
10.03.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 12.04.2017 [2017/15] |
15.02.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.01.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.12.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.12.2016 |
New entry: Fee payment for extension state |
|
13.12.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
19.08.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
19.08.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.12.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.12.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.07.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.05.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|