Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015185251 | Global Dossier | 18.02.2016 | A4 | WO2015185251 | 10.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP61704 | 05.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015185143 | Global Dossier | 10.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP61704 | 05.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6791761B | Global Dossier | 25.11.2020 | B2 | JP2017525586 | 07.09.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015EP57754 | 09.04.2015 | WO2014EP61704 | 05.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6872906B | Global Dossier | 19.05.2021 | B2 | JP2017520427 | 27.07.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP61704 | 05.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3152022 | Global Dossier | 04.08.2021 | B1 | EP3152022 | 12.04.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP61704 | 05.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106471194B | Global Dossier | 11.08.2020 | B | CN106471194 | 01.03.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015EP57754 | 09.04.2015 | WO2014EP61704 | 05.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106470813B | Global Dossier | 27.12.2019 | B | CN106470813 | 01.03.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP61704 | 05.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2014396515B | Global Dossier | 16.05.2019 | B2 | AU2014396515 | 15.12.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP61704 | 05.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3152023 | Global Dossier | 12.04.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015EP57754 | 09.04.2015 | WO2014EP61704 | 05.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR100730 | 26.10.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP61704 | 05.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR118003 | 08.09.2021 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP61704 | 05.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3152022T | 30.08.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP61704 | 05.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2887363T | 22.12.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP61704 | 05.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3152022T | 13.12.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP61704 | 05.06.2014 | EP14728936 | 05.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT3152022T | 24.09.2021 | T | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP61704 | 05.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2693688 | 04.07.2019 | C2 | RU2016151586 | 10.07.2018 | A3 | RU2016151586 | 10.07.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP61704 | 05.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2681780 | 12.03.2019 | C2 | RU2016151594 | 06.09.2018 | A3 | RU2016151594 | 10.07.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015EP57754 | 09.04.2015 | WO2014EP61704 | 05.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | UA120515 | 26.12.2019 | C2 | Priority number | Date | WO2015EP57754 | 09.04.2015 | WO2014EP61704 | 05.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | UA122128 | 25.09.2020 | C2 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP61704 | 05.06.2014 |