Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP3137073 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201580016721 EP15717916 EP2015059037W JP2017505724 KR20167030222 US201615334722



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9877963Global Dossier 30.01.2018B2
US2017042888 16.02.2017A1
Priority number Date
EP14166497 30.04.2014
WO2015EP59037 27.04.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR101869185BGlobal Dossier 19.06.2018B1
KR20160130517 11.11.2016A
Priority number Date
EP14166497 30.04.2014
WO2015EP59037 27.04.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6283766BGlobal Dossier 21.02.2018B2
JP2017511385 20.04.2017A
Priority number Date
EP14166497 30.04.2014
WO2015EP59037 27.04.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN106163520BGlobal Dossier 13.12.2019B
CN106163520 23.11.2016A
Priority number Date
EP14166497 30.04.2014
WO2015EP59037 27.04.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3137073Global Dossier 06.06.2018B1
EP3137073 08.03.2017A1
Priority number Date
EP14166497 30.04.2014
WO2015EP59037 27.04.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CY1120508T 10.07.2019T1
Priority number Date
EP14166497 30.04.2014
WO2015EP59037 27.04.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2683184T 25.09.2018T3
Priority number Date
EP14166497 30.04.2014
WO2015EP59037 27.04.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HRP20181205T 21.09.2018T1
Priority number Date
EP14166497 30.04.2014
EP15717916 27.04.2015
WO2015EP59037 27.04.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MA39927 28.09.2018B1
MA39927 08.03.2017A
Priority number Date
EP14166497 30.04.2014
EP15717916 27.04.2015
WO2015EP59037 27.04.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MY189930 22.03.2022A
Priority number Date
EP14166497 30.04.2014
WO2015EP59037 27.04.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PH12016501784 07.11.2016B1
PH12016501784 07.11.2016A1
Priority number Date
EP14166497 30.04.2014
WO2015EP59037 27.04.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RS57535 31.10.2018B1
Priority number Date
EP14166497 30.04.2014
EP15717916 27.04.2015
WO2015EP59037 27.04.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SG11201608397U 29.11.2016A
Priority number Date
EP14166497 30.04.2014
WO2015EP59037 27.04.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SI3137073T 28.09.2018T1
Priority number Date
EP14166497 30.04.2014
EP15717916 27.04.2015
WO2015EP59037 27.04.2015
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2015165842Global Dossier 05.11.2015A1
Priority number Date
EP14166497 30.04.2014
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AR100209 21.09.2016A1
Priority number Date
EP14166497 30.04.2014
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PT3137073T 27.07.2018T
Priority number Date
EP14166497 30.04.2014
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
SG10201909382U 28.11.2019A
Priority number Date
EP14166497 30.04.2014
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TR201809598T 23.07.2018T4
Priority number Date
EP14166497 30.04.2014