EP3138370 - HIGH CURRENT SWITCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ellenberger & Poensgen GmbH Industriestrasse 2-8 90518 Altdorf / DE | [2017/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ULLERMANN, Wolfgang Am Falbenholzweg 11 91126 Schwabach / DE | 02 /
MECKLER, Peter Mittelweg 30a 91224 Hohenstadt/Pommelsbrunn / DE | 03 /
ENGEWALD, Manuel Ziegelsteinstr. 222a 90411 Nürnberg / DE | 04 /
SCHWARZ, Matthias Steinfeldstr. 28 90559 Burgthann / DE | 05 /
SCHNEIDER, Ewald Espanstrasse 23a 91238 Offenhausen / DE | 06 /
MIKLIS, Markus Erlenweg 4c 90592 Pfeifferhütte / DE | [2017/10] | Representative(s) | FDST Patentanwälte Nordostpark 16 90411 Nürnberg / DE | [2017/10] | Application number, filing date | 15718140.5 | 04.04.2015 | [2017/10] | WO2015EP00728 | Priority number, date | DE20141006346 | 30.04.2014 Original published format: DE102014006346 | [2017/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015165568 | Date: | 05.11.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3138370 | Date: | 08.03.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H05K1/02, H05K3/34, B60R16/02, F02N11/08, H01L25/07 | [2017/10] | CPC: |
H05K1/0263 (EP,CN,KR,US);
F02N11/087 (EP,KR,US);
H01H45/00 (US);
H01L24/48 (EP,US);
H01L25/072 (EP,KR,US);
H02M7/00 (EP,KR,US);
H05K3/3421 (EP,CN,KR,US);
F02N2011/0874 (EP,KR,US);
H01L2224/48137 (EP,KR,US);
H01L2224/48139 (US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/13055 (EP,US);
H01L2924/13091 (US);
H05K2201/0382 (EP,CN,US);
H05K2201/09054 (EP,CN,US);
H05K2201/09063 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H05K2201/10166 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H05K2201/10272 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H05K2201/10553 (EP,CN,KR,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/05599 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45099 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/85399 (US,EP);
H01L2924/13055, H01L2924/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/10] | Title | German: | HOCHSTROMSCHALTER | [2017/10] | English: | HIGH CURRENT SWITCH | [2017/10] | French: | COMMUTATEUR DE COURANT HAUTE INTENSITÉ | [2017/10] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/10] | 02.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP2254152 (HAMILTON SUNDSTRAND CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,5,10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0005] , [0010] , [0011] , [0012] , [0014] , [0017] , [0018] * [I] 3,4; | [I]EP2043412 (CATEM DEVELEC GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [I] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0033] , [0044] , [0045] *; | [I]US6395999 (PLOIX OLIVIER [FR]) [I] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2008054373 (CHEN YIN-YUAN [TW], et al) [X] 1,2,6,9,10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0027] * [I] 3-5; | [XI]DE10254910 (AUTONETWORKS TECHNOLOGIES LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7,9,10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0 66] , [0 70] , [0 80] - [0086] - [ 100] * [I] 3,8 |