Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6574788B | Global Dossier | 11.09.2019 | B2 | JP2017523298 | 17.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015EP57944 | 13.04.2015 | DE102014006475 | 29.04.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3137237 | Global Dossier | 07.02.2018 | B1 | EP3137237 | 08.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015EP57944 | 13.04.2015 | DE102014006475 | 29.04.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112016024390 | 15.08.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2015EP57944 | 13.04.2015 | DE102014006475 | 29.04.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2692359 | 24.06.2019 | C2 | RU2016146401 | 11.10.2018 | A3 | RU2016146401 | 29.05.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015EP57944 | 13.04.2015 | DE102014006475 | 29.04.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015165723 | Global Dossier | 05.11.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102014006475 | 29.04.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102014006475 | 15.09.2016 | B4 | DE102014006475 | 29.10.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102014006475 | 29.04.2014 |