EP3134874 - START NODE DETERMINATION FOR TREE TRAVERSAL IN RAY TRACING APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 14.08.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.05.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 16.09.2020 [2020/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2017/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OBERT, Juraj 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
GOEL, Vineet 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
MOURI, Ouns 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2017/09] | Representative(s) | Loveless, Ian Mark Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/09] | Loveless, Ian Mark Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 15718418.5 | 17.04.2015 | [2017/09] | WO2015US26406 | Priority number, date | US201414257385 | 21.04.2014 Original published format: US201414257385 | [2017/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015164204 | Date: | 29.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3134874 | Date: | 01.03.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06T15/06 | [2017/09] | CPC: |
G06T15/06 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06T15/08 (KR);
G06T17/005 (KR);
G06T2210/12 (EP,CN,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/09] | Title | German: | STARTKNOTENBESTIMMUNG FÜR BAUMTRAVERSIERUNG IN STRAHLVERFOLGUNGSANWENDUNGEN | [2017/09] | English: | START NODE DETERMINATION FOR TREE TRAVERSAL IN RAY TRACING APPLICATIONS | [2017/09] | French: | DÉTERMINATION DE NOEUD DE DÉPART DE TRAVERSÉE D'ARBORESCENCE D'APPLICATIONS DE LANCER DE RAYON | [2017/09] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/09] | 12.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/38] | 30.04.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.05.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2008259075 (FOWLER DAVID KEITH [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-12,14-19,21-26,28 * abstract * * figures 3,4,7,8 * [I] 6,13,20,27; | [XI]US2009262132 (PETERSON LUKE TILMAN [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-12,14-19,21-26,28 * abstract * * figures 1,7,11 * [I] 6,13,20,27; | [XI]US2010289799 (HANIKA JOHANNES [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,7-12,14-19,21-26,28 * abstract * * figures 1,3,4 * [I] 6,13,20,27; | [XI]US2011316855 (MEJDRICH ERIC O [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-12,14-19,21-26,28 * abstract * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0024] * * figures 1-8 * [I] 6,13,20,27; | [A] - INGO WALD ET AL, "State of the Art in Ray Tracing Animated Scenes", EUROGRAPHICS TECHNICAL REPORT SERIES, EUROGRAPHICS, AIRE-LA-VILLE, FR, (20070901), ISSN 1017-4656, pages 89 - 116, XP007908773 [A] 1-28 * the whole document * |