Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3149716 | Global Dossier | 26.08.2020 | B1 | EP3149716 | 05.04.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015US26566 | 19.04.2015 | US201414288578 | 28.05.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015183427 | Global Dossier | 03.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414288578 | 28.05.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11188993 | Global Dossier | 30.11.2021 | B2 | US2015348220 | 03.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414288578 | 28.05.2014 |