EP3129059 - NOVEL COMBINATION BETWEEN 8-CYCLOPROPYL-3-[2-(3-FLUOROPHENYL) ETHYL]-7,8-DIHYDRO-3H-[1,3]OXAZINO[6,5-G][1,2,3]BENZOTRIAZINE-4,9-DIONEAND AN ACETYLCHOLINESTERASE INHIBITOR, AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.04.2019 [2019/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Les Laboratoires Servier 35, rue de Verdun 92284 Suresnes Cedex / FR | [2017/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRETIN, Sylvie 37 Rue Pierre et Marie Curie F-92160 Antony / FR | 02 /
PUEYO, Maria 2 Boulevard Arago F-75013 Paris / FR | [2017/07] | Application number, filing date | 15719502.5 | 03.04.2015 | [2017/07] | WO2015FR50879 | Priority number, date | FR20140053046 | 07.04.2014 Original published format: FR 1453046 | [2017/07] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015155451 | Date: | 15.10.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3129059 | Date: | 15.02.2017 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K45/06, A61K31/445, A61K31/5365, A61P25/28, A61K9/00, A61K31/27, A61K31/55 | [2017/07] | CPC: |
A61K31/5365 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K31/27 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K31/445 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K31/55 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K9/2013 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/2018 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/2054 (US);
A61K9/2059 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61K2300/00 (KR)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/27, A61K2300/00 (US,CN,EP);
A61K31/445, A61K2300/00 (US,CN,EP);
A61K31/5365, A61K2300/00 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/55, A61K2300/00 (US,CN,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/07] | Extension states | BA | 30.09.2016 | ME | 30.09.2016 | Validation states | MA | 30.09.2016 | Title | German: | NEUARTIGE KOMBINATION ZWISCHEN 8-CYCLOPROPYL-3-[2-(3-FLUORPHENYL)ETHYL]-7,8-DIHYDRO-3H-[1,3]OXAZINO[6,5-G][1,2,3]BENZOTRIAZIN-4,9-DION UND ACETYLCHOLINESTERASE-INHIBITOREN SOWIE PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN DAMIT | [2017/07] | English: | NOVEL COMBINATION BETWEEN 8-CYCLOPROPYL-3-[2-(3-FLUOROPHENYL) ETHYL]-7,8-DIHYDRO-3H-[1,3]OXAZINO[6,5-G][1,2,3]BENZOTRIAZINE-4,9-DIONEAND AN ACETYLCHOLINESTERASE INHIBITOR, AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING SAME | [2017/07] | French: | NOUVELLE ASSOCIATION ENTRE LE 8-CYCLOPROPYL-3-[2-(3-FLUOROPHENYL) ETHYL]-7,8-DIHYDRO-3H-[1,3]OXAZINO[6,5-G][1,2,3]BENZOTRIAZINE-4,9-DIONE ET UN INHIBITEUR DE L'ACETYLCHOLINESTERASE, ET COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES CONTENANT CELLE-CI | [2017/07] | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/07] | 30.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/15] | 29.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2005072345 (CORTEX PHARMA INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0019]; figure -; example -; claim - * * paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0072] * * paragraph [0091] *; | [YD]WO2008085506 (CORTEX PHARMA INC [US], et al) [YD] 1-15 * claim - *; | [Y]WO2009038752 (CORTEX PHARMA INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 5, line 20 - page 6, line 10; claim 27 *; | [Y] - SIMON J. A. GROVE ET AL, "Positive Allosteric Modulators of the [alpha]-Amino-3-hydroxy-5-methyl-4-isoxazolepropionic Acid (AMPA) Receptor", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (20101028), vol. 53, no. 20, doi:10.1021/jm1000419, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 7271 - 7279, XP055141406 [Y] 1-15 * page 7271, column 2, line 11 * * page 7274, column 2, paragraph 1 * * table 1; compound 12 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm1000419 | by applicant | WO2008085506 | - ROBBINS ET AL., TRENDS IN PHARMACOL. SCI., (2006), vol. 27, no. 3, pages 141 - 148 | - ADVOKAT ET AL., NEUROSCIENCE & BIOBEHAV. REV., (1992), vol. 16, pages 13 - 24 | - FRANCIS ET AL., PROGRESS IN NEUROBIOLOGY, (1992), vol. 39, no. 5, pages 517 - 545 | - BLACK, P.SYCHOPHARMACOL., (2005), vol. 179, pages 154 - 163 | - O'NEILL ET AL., IDRUGS, (2007), vol. 10, no. 3, pages 185 - 192 | - YUEDE ET AL., BEHAV. PHARMACOL., (2007), vol. 18, no. 5-6, pages 347 - 363 | - CÉLÉRIER ET AL., LEARN ME, (2004), vol. 11, no. 2, pages 196 - 204 | - TRONCHE ET AL., E AV. BRAIN RES., (2010), vol. 215, no. 2, pages 255 - 260 | - GOLD ET AL., EXPERT REV. NEUROTHER., (2008), vol. 8, no. 12, pages 1879 - 1891 | - SHAPIRO, RCH. NEUROL., (2001), vol. 58, pages 874 - 881 | - GRUART ET AL., ! NEUROSCI., (2006), vol. 24, pages 1077 - 1087 |