EP3129696 - MOUNT THAT FACILITATES POSITIONING AND ORIENTING A MOBILE COMPUTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.04.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.05.2018 [2018/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2017/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAY, Jonathan c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
FAY, Daniel c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2017/07] | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/07] | Fischer, Michael Maria, et al Olswang Germany LLP IP Rosental 4 80331 Munich / DE | Application number, filing date | 15719895.3 | 31.03.2015 | [2017/07] | WO2015US23454 | Priority number, date | US201414246587 | 07.04.2014 Original published format: US201414246587 | [2017/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015157023 | Date: | 15.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3129696 | Date: | 15.02.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F16M11/10, F16M11/20 | [2017/07] | CPC: |
F16M11/10 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04N23/50 (KR);
F16M11/18 (EP,US);
F16M11/2014 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G03B17/561 (CN,KR,US);
H04M1/06 (KR);
H04N23/698 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/07] | Title | German: | HALTERUNG ZUR ERLEICHTERUNG DER POSITIONIERUNG UND AUSRICHTUNG EINER MOBILEN RECHNERVORRICHTUNG | [2017/07] | English: | MOUNT THAT FACILITATES POSITIONING AND ORIENTING A MOBILE COMPUTING DEVICE | [2017/07] | French: | PIED FACILITANT LE POSITIONNEMENT ET L'ORIENTATION D'UN DISPOSITIF INFORMATIQUE MOBILE | [2017/07] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/07] | 04.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0237825 (VERGHESE GILBERT [CA]) [X] 1-15 * page 7, line 19 - page 8, line 12 * * page 9, line 23 - line 26 * * page 10, line 3 - line 6 * * page 11, line 30 - page 12, line 28; figures 1-4 *; | [X]US2007133979 (LACKEY ROBERT C [US], et al) [X] 1-15* paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0045]; figures 1-11b *; | [X]EP2461568 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0056]; figures 1-8 *; | [X]US2013230293 (BOYLE CHRISTOPHER T [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0036] - [0037] - [0041] - [0044] - [0053] , [0056]; figures 1-7 * |