EP3277375 - IRON PLATINUM PARTICLES FOR ADHERENCE OF BIOLOGICS ON MEDICAL IMPLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.10.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.07.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yale University 2 Whitney Avenue New Haven, CT 06510 / US | [2019/45] |
Former [2018/06] | For all designated states Yale University 2 Whitney Avenue New Haven, CT 06510 / US | ||
For all designated states Magnus Flow Limited 26 Red Lion Square London WC1R 4AG / GB | |||
For all designated states University College London Gower Street London WC1E 6BT / GB | |||
For all designated states Queen Mary University of London Mile End Road London E1 4NS / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAHMY, Tarek 5 Colony Road New Haven, CT 06511 / US | 02 /
SINUSAS, Albert 490 Briarwood Drive Guilford, CT 06437 / US | 03 /
LEE, Jung, Seok c/o Yale University Biomedical Engineering Malone Engineering Center 55 Prospect Street New Haven, CT 06211 / US | 04 /
KIM, Dongin 3832 Westfield Dr. College Station, TX 77845 / US | 05 /
MATHUR, Anthony c/o Magnus Flow Limited 26 Red Lion Square London WC1R 4AG / GB | 06 /
MARTIN, John c/o Magnus Flow Limited 26 Red Lion Square London WC1R 4AG / GB | [2020/52] |
Former [2018/06] | 01 /
FAHMY, Tarek 5 Colony Road New Haven, CT 06511 / US | ||
02 /
SINUSAS, Albert 490 Briarwood Drive Guilford, CT 06437 / US | |||
03 /
LEE, Jung, Seok c/o Yale University Biomedical Engineering Malone Engineering Center 55 Prospect Street New Haven, CT 06211 / US | |||
04 /
KIM, Dongin 113 Worthington Road Glastonbury, CT 06033 / US | |||
05 /
MATHUR, Anthony c/o Magnus Flow Limited 26 Red Lion Square London WC1R 4AG / GB | |||
06 /
MARTIN, John c/o Magnus Flow Limited 26 Red Lion Square London WC1R 4AG / GB | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/52] | Potter Clarkson The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2018/06] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 15719901.9 | 01.04.2015 | [2018/06] | WO2015US23880 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016160012 | Date: | 06.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3277375 | Date: | 07.02.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3277375 | Date: | 23.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61N2/06, A61N2/00 | [2018/06] | CPC: |
A61N2/002 (EP,US);
A61K41/0052 (US);
A61K35/44 (US);
A61K35/545 (US);
A61L27/025 (US);
A61L27/042 (US);
A61L27/047 (US);
A61L27/06 (US);
A61L27/18 (US);
A61L27/306 (US);
A61L27/34 (US);
A61L27/58 (US);
A61L31/022 (US);
A61L31/028 (US);
A61L31/06 (US);
A61L31/088 (US);
A61L31/10 (US);
A61L31/148 (US);
A61N2/06 (EP,US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/14 (EP);
A61F2/82 (US);
A61F2210/0076 (EP,US);
A61F2210/009 (EP,US);
A61L2400/18 (US);
A61L2420/02 (US);
A61L2420/06 (US);
A61L2420/08 (US);
A61L2430/20 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EISENPLATINPARTIKEL ZUR HAFTUNG VON BIOLOGIKA AUF MEDIZINISCHEN IMPLANTATEN | [2018/06] | English: | IRON PLATINUM PARTICLES FOR ADHERENCE OF BIOLOGICS ON MEDICAL IMPLANTS | [2018/06] | French: | PARTICULES DE PLATINE ET DE FER POUR L'ADHÉRENCE D'AGENTS BIOLOGIQUES SUR DES IMPLANTS MÉDICAUX | [2018/06] | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/06] | 30.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 25.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.11.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.09.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.04.2015 | AL | 23.12.2020 | AT | 23.12.2020 | CY | 23.12.2020 | CZ | 23.12.2020 | DK | 23.12.2020 | EE | 23.12.2020 | FI | 23.12.2020 | HR | 23.12.2020 | LT | 23.12.2020 | LV | 23.12.2020 | MC | 23.12.2020 | MK | 23.12.2020 | MT | 23.12.2020 | NL | 23.12.2020 | PL | 23.12.2020 | RO | 23.12.2020 | RS | 23.12.2020 | SE | 23.12.2020 | SI | 23.12.2020 | SK | 23.12.2020 | SM | 23.12.2020 | BG | 23.03.2021 | NO | 23.03.2021 | GR | 24.03.2021 | IE | 01.04.2021 | LU | 01.04.2021 | IS | 23.04.2021 | PT | 23.04.2021 | BE | 30.04.2021 | CH | 30.04.2021 | LI | 30.04.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 01.04.2015 | |
AL | 23.12.2020 | ||
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CY | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
MK | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IE | 01.04.2021 | ||
LU | 01.04.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 01.04.2015 | |
AL | 23.12.2020 | ||
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CY | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IE | 01.04.2021 | ||
LU | 01.04.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 01.04.2015 | |
AL | 23.12.2020 | ||
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IE | 01.04.2021 | ||
LU | 01.04.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IE | 01.04.2021 | ||
LU | 01.04.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IE | 01.04.2021 | ||
LU | 01.04.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IE | 01.04.2021 | ||
LU | 01.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LU | 01.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LU | 01.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
LU | 01.04.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
AT | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 23.12.2020 | |
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 23.12.2020 | |
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 23.12.2020 | |
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 23.12.2020 | |
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | CZ | 23.12.2020 | |
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | CZ | 23.12.2020 | |
FI | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 23.12.2020 | |
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | FI | 23.12.2020 | |
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/30] | FI | 23.12.2020 | |
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
NL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | FI | 23.12.2020 | |
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 23.12.2020 | |
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SE | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 23.12.2020 | |
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 23.12.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO03051451 (STEREOTAXIS INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,8,14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0041] - [0043]; figure -; claims 1-7 * [I] 3-7,9-13,20; | [A]WO2004093643 (PHILADELPHIA CHILDREN HOSPITAL [US], et al) [A] 1,2,8-20,25-27 * abstract * * page 9, lines 21-27 * * page 9, line 30 - page 10, line 1 * * page 16, lines 13-18 * * page 17, lines 7-25 * * page 25, lines 2-5 *; | [A]US2006041182 (FORBES ZACHARY G [US], et al) [A] 1,25-27 * abstract * * paragraphs [0095] , [0102] , [0105] , [0115] , [0118] , [0169]; figure - *; | [A]WO2008034030 (BOSTON SCIENT SCIMED INC [US], et al) [A] 1,7-14,20 * abstract ** page 3, lines 9-25; figure -; claim - *; | [ID]WO2013045956 (MAGNUS STENT IC, et al) [ID] 1-20,25-27 * abstract * * page 6, line 16 - page 8, line 28 * * page 9, line 9 - page 10, line 5; claim - * | by applicant | US5059211 | US5306286 | WO9851812 | WO9908623 | US5891108 | WO9932536 | US5935506 | US6045568 | WO0056376 | US6746869 | WO2004062533 | WO2005046522 | US6918929 | US6923828 | US6945992 | WO2005099967 | WO2005104990 | US6986785 | US7060090 | US7144419 | US7163555 | WO2007006562 | US7323008 | US2009234538 | US7618448 | US7651527 | US7655034 | US7678141 | US7744645 | WO2010118883 | US7942917 | US8001925 | WO2011107243 | US8034099 | US8048149 | US8066760 | US8100960 | US8157855 | US8172893 | US8182524 | US8187284 | US8187322 | US8197528 | US8206432 | US8221490 | US8231669 | US8236044 | US8252048 | US8252065 | US8257425 | US8257431 | US8292945 | US8298278 | US8298280 | US8348991 | US8348992 | US8348993 | US8353952 | US8359998 | US8361140 | US8372134 | US8372138 | US8377112 | US8388676 | US8398695 | WO2013045956 | US8414637 | US8414639 | US8414656 | WO2014067656 | - J. APPL. PHYS., (1999), vol. 85, page 4325 | - SCIENCE, (2000), vol. 287, page 1989 | - J. APPL. PHYS., (2002), vol. 91, page 8477 | - ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED, (2004), vol. 43, page 1115 | - ADV. MATER., (2005), vol. 17, page 429 | - CHEM. MATER., (2008), vol. 20, page 2274 | - HO ET AL., ACC CHEM RES., (2011), vol. 44, no. 10, pages 875 - 882 | - SUN ET AL., IEEE TRANS. MAGN., (2001), vol. 37, pages 1239 - 1243 | - SHEVCHENKO ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2002), vol. 124, no. 38, pages 11480 - 11485 | - KANG ET AL., NANO LETT., (2002), vol. 2, no. 3, pages 1033 - 1036 | - JEYADEVAN ET AL., J. APPL. PHYS., (2003), vol. 93, no. 10, page 7574 | - ELKINS ET AL., NANO LETTERS, (2003), vol. 3, no. 12, pages 1647 - 49 | - SANTRA, LANGMUIR, (2001), vol. 17, pages 2900 - 06 | - AKBARZADEH ET AL., NANOTECH., SCI., APPLIC., (2012), vol. 5, pages 13 - 25 | - BUSINOVA ET AL., NANOCONLL, (20110921), page 6 | - J UROL., (200308), vol. 170, no. 2, pages 468 - 71 | - TANGUAY, J. F. ET AL., CARDIOLOGY CLINICS, (1994), vol. 12, pages 699 - 713 | - VAN DER GIESSEN ET AL., "Marked Inflammatory Sequelae to Implantation of Biodegradable and Nonbiodegradable Polymers in Porcine Coronary Arteries", CIRCULATION, (1996), vol. 94, pages 1690 - 1697, XP002068343 | - TANGUAY ET AL., CARDIOLOGY CLINICS, (1994), vol. 12, pages 699 - 713 | - J. E. SOUSA ET AL., CIRCULATION, (2003), vol. 107, page 2274 | - SALU ET AL., ACTA CARDIOL, (2004), vol. 59, page 51 | - GARCIA-GARCIA, ACHIVOS DE CARDIOLOGIA, DE MEXICO, (2006), vol. 76, no. 3, pages 297 - 319 | - PUSKAS ET AL., "Drug-eluting Stent Coatings", WIRES NANOMEDICINE AND NANOBIOTECHNOLOGY, (2009), page 12 | - NKANSAH ET AL., MAGN RESON MED, (2011), vol. 65, no. 6, pages 1776 - 1785 | - K. HOSHINO ET AL., LAB ON CHIP, (2011), vol. 11, pages 3449 - 3457 | - SHAPIRO ET AL., MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, (2005), vol. 53, no. 2, pages 329 - 338 | - LEE ET AL., BIOMATERIALS, (2010), vol. 31, no. 12, pages 3296 - 3306 | - WANG ET AL., BIOMATERIALS, (2010), vol. 31, no. 13, pages 3502 - 3511 | - LIM ET AL., SMALL, (2008), vol. 4, no. 10, pages 1640 - 1645 | - ARBAB, NMR IN BIOMEDICINE, (2005), vol. 18, no. 6, pages 383 - 389 | - ARBAB ET AL., MOLECULAR IMAGING, (2004), vol. 3, no. 1, pages 24 - 32 | - HSIAO, MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, (2007), vol. 58, no. 4, pages 717 - 724 | - TAYLOR ET AL., J. HEART LUNG TRANSPLANT., (2005), vol. 24, pages 945 - 955 | - BURKE ET AL., TRANSPLANTATION, (1995), vol. 60, pages 1413 - 1417 | - CORNELL; COLVIN, CURR. OPIN. NEPHROL HYPERTENS., (2005), vol. 14, pages 229 - 234 | GB20140008210 |