EP3137879 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ANALYZING ANALYTE(S) FROM A FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/10] | DEVICE FOR ANALYZING ANALYTE(S) FROM A FLUID | ||
[2024/02] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Energie Atomique et aux Energies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [2017/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POUTEAU, Patrick 10 Allée Château Corbeau 38240 Meylan / FR | 02 /
BELLEMIN COMTE, Amélie 222 chemin du referon 3834 Voreppe / FR | 03 /
FONTELAYE, Caroline 22 Rue Dode 38500 Voiron / FR | 04 /
PERRAUT, François Le Fond de Rivière 38134 Saint Joseph de Rivière / FR | [2017/30] |
Former [2017/10] | 01 /
POUTEAU, Patrick 10 Allée Château Corbeau 38240 Meylan / FR | ||
02 /
BELLEMIN COMTE, Amélie 94 Cours Berriat 38000 Grenoble / FR | |||
03 /
FONTELAYE, Caroline 22 Rue Dode 38500 Voiron / FR | |||
04 /
PERRAUT, François Le Fond de Rivière 38134 Saint Joseph de Rivière / FR | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2017/10] | Application number, filing date | 15720317.5 | 28.04.2015 | [2017/10] | WO2015EP59131 | Priority number, date | FR20140053823 | 28.04.2014 Original published format: FR 1453823 | [2017/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015165867 | Date: | 05.11.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3137879 | Date: | 08.03.2017 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3137879 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/64, B01L3/00 | [2017/10] | CPC: |
B01L3/5027 (EP);
G01N21/6428 (EP);
G01N21/6456 (EP);
B01L2300/0851 (EP);
B01L2300/168 (EP);
B01L2400/086 (EP);
G01N21/6458 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND METHODE ZUR ANALYSE EINES ODER MEHRERER ANALYTEN AUS EINER FLÜSSIGKEIT | [2024/02] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ANALYZING ANALYTE(S) FROM A FLUID | [2024/02] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE D'ANALYSE D'ANALYTE(S) D'UN FLUIDE | [2024/02] |
Former [2017/10] | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ANALYSE EINES ODER MEHRERER ANALYTEN AUS EINER FLÜSSIGKEIT | ||
Former [2017/10] | DEVICE FOR ANALYZING ANALYTE(S) FROM A FLUID | ||
Former [2017/10] | DISPOSITIF D'ANALYSE D'ANALYTE(S) D'UN FLUIDE | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/10] | 26.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 05.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2010111762 (CHO SEONG-HO [KR]); | [A]US2010204057 (LEE KYU-SANG [KR], et al); | [XYI]WO2012094642 (ON Q ITY [US], et al); | [A]US2014045209 (CHOU STEPHEN Y [US], et al); | [Y]US2014099732 (WALAVALKAR SAMEER SUDHIR [US], et al); | [XP]EP2803410 (IMEC [BE]) |