EP3134473 - LIGHTWEIGHT STYRENE POLYMER COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.09.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INEOS Styrolution Group GmbH Erlenstrasse 2 60325 Frankfurt / DE | [2017/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIESSNER, Norbert Im Haag 17 67159 Friedelsheim / DE | 02 /
ABBOUD, Mohammed 21 N Herbert Road Riverside, IL 60546 / US | 03 /
CHUNG, Andrew 1381 Tara Belle Parkway Naperville, IL 60564 / US | [2017/09] | Representative(s) | Jacobi, Markus Alexander Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/09] | Jacobi, Markus Alexander Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 15720926.3 | 24.04.2015 | [2017/09] | WO2015EP58881 | Priority number, date | EP20140165955 | 25.04.2014 Original published format: EP 14165955 | [2017/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015162242 | Date: | 29.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3134473 | Date: | 01.03.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C08L55/02, C08L51/04, C08J9/32, C08J9/10, C08K7/28, C08K5/23, // C08L53/02 | [2017/40] | CPC: |
C08J9/32 (EP,US);
B29C45/0001 (US);
B29C45/0053 (US);
C08J9/103 (EP,US);
C08K5/23 (EP,US);
C08K7/28 (EP,US);
C08L51/003 (EP,US);
C08L51/04 (EP,US);
C08L53/02 (EP,US);
C08L55/02 (EP,US);
B29K2101/12 (US);
B29K2309/08 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08L51/04, C08L51/003, C08K7/28, C08L53/02, C08K5/23 (US,EP);
C08L55/02, C08L51/003, C08K7/28, C08L53/02, C08K5/23 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2017/09] | C08L55/02, C08K7/28, C08L51/04, C08J9/32, C08J9/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/09] | Title | German: | LEICHTE STYROLPOLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2017/09] | English: | LIGHTWEIGHT STYRENE POLYMER COMPOSITIONS | [2017/09] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE POLYMÈRE STYRÉNIQUE LÉGER | [2017/09] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/09] | 10.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/31] | 16.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]CN102746606 (POLYMER SCI SHENZHEN NEW MAT) [AD] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [A]CN103509313 (HUBEI SUORUI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-18 * example -; table - *; | [A]US2012316261 (BRADLEY GERARD [FR]) [A] 1-18 * example - * * paragraph [0071] *; | [A]US2013116353 (JANG YOUNG HAK [KR], et al) [A] 1-18 * example - * |