EP3120442 - ELECTRIC MOTOR, IN PARTICULAR EXTERNAL ROTOR MOTOR, AND INTERMEDIATE INSULATING PART FOR AN ELECTRIC MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.01.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZIEHL-ABEGG SE Heinz-Ziehl-Strasse 74653 Künzelsau / DE | [2017/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZECHALKO, Paul Leisklinge 38 74635 Kupferzell / DE | 02 /
STURM, Thorsten Zum Lindenbaum 36 74238 Krautheim / DE | [2017/04] | Representative(s) | Jackisch-Kohl, Anna-Katharina Patentanwälte Jackisch-Kohl & Kohl Stuttgarter Strasse 115 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2017/04] | Application number, filing date | 15721116.0 | 17.03.2015 | [2017/04] | WO2015EP00581 | Priority number, date | DE20141004262 | 20.03.2014 Original published format: DE102014004262 | [2017/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015139831 | Date: | 24.09.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3120442 | Date: | 25.01.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3120442 | Date: | 03.06.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H02K11/00, H02K5/08, H02K11/33, H02K5/10, H02K5/18, // H02K9/22, H02K21/22 | [2018/17] | CPC: |
H02K5/08 (EP,US);
H02K5/10 (CN,US);
H02K11/0094 (US);
H02K11/33 (EP,US);
H02K5/18 (US);
H02K21/22 (EP,US);
H02K9/223 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/04] | H02K5/08, H02K11/00, H02K21/22, H02K9/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROMOTOR, INSBESONDERE AUSSENLÄUFERMOTOR, SOWIE ZWISCHENISOLIERTEIL FÜR EINEN ELEKTROMOTOR | [2017/04] | English: | ELECTRIC MOTOR, IN PARTICULAR EXTERNAL ROTOR MOTOR, AND INTERMEDIATE INSULATING PART FOR AN ELECTRIC MOTOR | [2017/04] | French: | MOTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE, EN PARTICULIER MOTEUR À ROTOR EXTÉRIEUR, ET INTERCALAIRE ISOLANT POUR MOTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE | [2017/04] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/04] | 02.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.03.2015 | AL | 03.06.2020 | CY | 03.06.2020 | CZ | 03.06.2020 | DK | 03.06.2020 | EE | 03.06.2020 | FI | 03.06.2020 | HR | 03.06.2020 | LT | 03.06.2020 | LV | 03.06.2020 | MC | 03.06.2020 | MK | 03.06.2020 | MT | 03.06.2020 | NL | 03.06.2020 | PL | 03.06.2020 | RO | 03.06.2020 | RS | 03.06.2020 | SE | 03.06.2020 | SK | 03.06.2020 | SM | 03.06.2020 | TR | 03.06.2020 | BG | 03.09.2020 | NO | 03.09.2020 | GR | 04.09.2020 | IS | 03.10.2020 | PT | 06.10.2020 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 17.03.2015 | |
AL | 03.06.2020 | ||
CY | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
MK | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
TR | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 17.03.2015 | |
AL | 03.06.2020 | ||
CY | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
MK | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 17.03.2015 | |
AL | 03.06.2020 | ||
CY | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 17.03.2015 | |
AL | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 03.06.2020 | |
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 03.06.2020 | |
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 03.06.2020 | |
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 03.06.2020 | |
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 03.06.2020 | |
NO | 03.09.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP1361644 (EBM WERKE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-5,10-13,15,16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] , [0 12] , [0 14] , [0 20] , [0 23] * [I] 6-9,14,17-19; | [A]EP1701431 (GRUNDFOS MANAGEMENT AS [DK]) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * paragraphs [0017] , [0 19] , [0 21] , [0 35] *; | [A]WO2009075247 (CALSONIC KANSEI CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-19 * abstract *; | [A]EP2226922 (ZIEHL ABEGG AG [DE]) [A] 1-19* abstract *; | [IA]US2013334906 (SONODA ISAO [JP], et al) [I] 1,6-11,14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] , [0 37] , [0 38] , [0063]; figures 1-12 * [A] 2-5,12,13,15-19 |