EP3138043 - VIDEO ANALYSIS SYSTEM FOR ENERGY-CONSUMING BUILDING EQUIPMENT AND INTELLIGENT BUILDING MANAGEMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.06.2021 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.07.2021 [2021/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carrier Corporation One Carrier Place Farmington, CT 06034 / US | [2017/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAO, Jianwei 3239 Shenjiang Road Pudong New Area Shanghai 201206 / CN | 02 /
KUANG, YuHui 3239 Shenjiang Road Pudong New Area Shanghai 201206 / CN | 03 /
CHIANG, Robert Hong-Leung 3239 Shenjiang Road Pudong New Area Shanghai 201206 / CN | [2017/10] | Representative(s) | Schmitt-Nilson Schraud Waibel Wohlfrom Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Pelkovenstraße 143 80992 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/10] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15721505.4 | 29.04.2015 | [2017/10] | WO2015US28134 | Priority number, date | CN201410179464 | 30.04.2014 Original published format: CN201410179464 | [2017/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015168204 | Date: | 05.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3138043 | Date: | 08.03.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00 | [2017/10] | CPC: |
G06V20/53 (EP,CN,US);
B66B27/00 (US);
B66B5/0012 (US);
F24F11/30 (EP,US);
F24F11/46 (EP,CN,US);
G06V20/46 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/10] | Title | German: | VIDEOANALYSESYSTEM FÜR ENERGIEVERBRAUCHENDE GEBÄUDEAUSRÜSTUNG UND INTELLIGENTES GEBÄUDEVERWALTUNGSSYSTEM | [2017/10] | English: | VIDEO ANALYSIS SYSTEM FOR ENERGY-CONSUMING BUILDING EQUIPMENT AND INTELLIGENT BUILDING MANAGEMENT SYSTEM | [2017/10] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ANALYSE VIDÉO POUR UN ÉQUIPEMENT D'IMMEUBLE CONSOMMATEUR D'ÉNERGIE ET SYSTÈME DE GESTION D'IMMEUBLE INTELLIGENT | [2017/10] | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/10] | 07.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/29] | 17.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2021 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [L]WO2007139658 (OBJECTVIDEO INC [US], et al) [L] 1-14 * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0053] ** paragraph [0073]; figures 1-11 * | Examination | WO03088157 | WO2007081345 | - JAYNES C ET AL, "The Terrascope Dataset: Scripted Multi-Camera Indoor Video Surveillance with Ground-truth", VISUAL SURVEILLANCE AND PERFORMANCE EVALUATION OF TRACKING AND SURVEIL LANCE, 2005. 2ND JOINT IEEE INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON BEIJING, CHINA 15-16 OCT. 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20051015), doi:10.1109/VSPETS.2005.1570930, ISBN 978-0-7803-9424-7, pages 309 - 316, XP010875401 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VSPETS.2005.1570930 | by applicant | US2005088520 | US2010322516 | US2011268321 | US8195598 | US2013113932 |