|
08.07.2020 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.2019 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2019 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.05.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2019 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.05.2019 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.05.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.2019 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.04.2019 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.2019 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
08.04.2019 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
15.03.2019 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2018 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2018 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2017 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.12.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2017 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.11.2017 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.09.2017 |
Information regarding early processing |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.07.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2017 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.07.2017 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
14.07.2017 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.07.2017 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.07.2017 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
14.07.2017 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.04.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.04.2017 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
05.04.2017 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
05.04.2017 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
05.04.2017 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
05.04.2017 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
24.03.2017 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
24.03.2017 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
24.03.2017 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
07.03.2017 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2017 |
Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) (without attachments) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.02.2017 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
25.01.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
25.01.2017 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
25.01.2017 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
25.01.2017 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
25.01.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
25.01.2017 |
Reply to International Search Opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
03.11.2016 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.11.2016 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
14.01.2016 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
13.01.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
13.01.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
13.01.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
11.05.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
30.04.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
30.04.2015 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
30.04.2015 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
3 |
|
30.04.2015 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
13 |
|
30.04.2015 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
4 |