EP3155464 - MIXTURE, NANO FIBER, AND POLARIZED LIGHT EMISSIVE FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.03.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2017/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASEGAWA, Masaki 2-6-14 Omachi Kamakura Kanagawa 248-0007 / JP | 02 /
DERTINGER, Stephan Sakura Estates Compound 16 5-11-26 Nakamachi Setagya Tokyo 158-0091 / JP | [2017/16] | Application number, filing date | 15722932.9 | 12.05.2015 | [2017/16] | WO2015EP00975 | Priority number, date | EP20140002045 | 13.06.2014 Original published format: EP 14002045 | [2017/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015188910 | Date: | 17.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3155464 | Date: | 19.04.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/30, C09K11/00, B82Y20/00, H01L29/06, B82Y10/00, G02F2/02 | [2017/16] | CPC: |
G02F2/02 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C09K11/02 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G02B5/3058 (US);
B29D11/00807 (US);
B29D7/01 (US);
C09K11/883 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G02B5/30 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/0665 (KR);
H01L29/0669 (KR);
B82Y10/00 (EP,KR,US);
B82Y20/00 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01L29/0673 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/16] | Title | German: | MISCHUNG, NANOFASER UND POLARISIERTER LICHTEMITTIERENDER FILM | [2017/16] | English: | MIXTURE, NANO FIBER, AND POLARIZED LIGHT EMISSIVE FILM | [2017/16] | French: | MÉLANGE, NANOFIBRE, ET FILM D'ÉMISSION DE LUMIÈRE POLARISÉE | [2017/16] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/16] | 28.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/16] | 06.12.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2008113214 (DAVIS JAMES LYNN [US], et al); | Examination | US2013233780 | US2014162521 |