EP3141060 - DEVICE-TO-DEVICE RESOURCE PATTERN SIGNALING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2021/27] |
Former [2017/11] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LU, Qianxi No.5 Lize East Street Chaoyang District Beijing 100102 / CN | 02 /
ZHAO, Zhenshan Ericsson Tower No.5 Lize East Street Chaoyang District Beijing 100102 / CN | 03 /
SORRENTINO, Stefano Hannebergsgatan 32 171 68 Solna / SE | [2021/27] |
Former [2017/11] | 01 /
LU, Qianxi No.5 Lize East Street Chaoyang District Beijing 100102 / CN | ||
02 /
ZHAO, Zhenshan Ericsson Tower No.5 Lize East Street Chaoyang District Beijing 100102 / CN | |||
03 /
SORRENTINO, Stefano Hannebergsgatan 32 S-171 68 Solna / SE | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2017/11] | Application number, filing date | 15723325.5 | 28.04.2015 | [2017/11] | WO2015SE50478 | Priority number, date | US201461991074P | 09.05.2014 Original published format: US 201461991074 P | [2017/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015171048 | Date: | 12.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3141060 | Date: | 15.03.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3141060 | Date: | 07.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04 | [2017/11] | CPC: |
H04W72/20 (EP,KR,RU,US);
H04W76/14 (RU,US);
H04W72/0446 (KR,RU,US);
H04W72/0453 (KR,RU,US);
H04W72/21 (RU,US);
H04W72/53 (EP,KR,US);
H04W74/0833 (RU,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | D2D-RESSOURCENMUSTERSIGNALISIERUNG | [2017/11] | English: | DEVICE-TO-DEVICE RESOURCE PATTERN SIGNALING | [2017/11] | French: | SIGNALISATION DE MODÈLE DE RESSOURCE DE DISPOSITIF À DISPOSITIF | [2017/11] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/11] | 06.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.05.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 07.07.2021 | AT | 07.07.2021 | CY | 07.07.2021 | CZ | 07.07.2021 | EE | 07.07.2021 | FI | 07.07.2021 | HR | 07.07.2021 | LT | 07.07.2021 | LV | 07.07.2021 | MC | 07.07.2021 | MK | 07.07.2021 | MT | 07.07.2021 | RO | 07.07.2021 | RS | 07.07.2021 | SI | 07.07.2021 | SK | 07.07.2021 | SM | 07.07.2021 | BG | 07.10.2021 | NO | 07.10.2021 | IS | 07.11.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | AL | 07.07.2021 | |
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CY | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
MK | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 07.07.2021 | |
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CY | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 07.07.2021 | |
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 07.07.2021 | |
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/12] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2013322413 (PELLETIER GHYSLAIN [CA], et al); | [A]WO2013191519 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | US2015189642 [ ] (YANG SUCKCHEL [KR], et al); |