EP3146010 - BINDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.09.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Knauf Insulation, Inc. One Knauf Drive Shelbyville, IN 46176 / US | For all designated states Knauf Insulation SPRL Rue de Maestricht 95 4600 Visé / BE | [2017/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAMPSON, Carl PO Box 10 Knauf Insulation Stafford Road St Helens Merseyside WA10 3NS / GB | 02 /
HAND, Richard PO Box 10 Knauf Insulation Stafford Road St Helens Merseyside WA10 3NS / GB | 03 /
ROBINSON, James PO Box 10 Knauf Insulation Stafford Road St Helens Merseyside WA10 3NS / GB | [2023/50] |
Former [2017/13] | 01 /
HAMPSON, Carl PO Box 10 Knauf Insulation Stafford Road St Helens Merseyside WA10 3NS / GB | ||
02 /
HAND, Richard PO Box 10 KnaufInsulation Stafford Road St Helens Merseyside WA10 3NS / GB | |||
03 /
ROBINSON, James PO Box 10 Knauf Insulation Stafford Road St Helens Merseyside WA10 3NS / GB | Representative(s) | ARC-IP ARC-IP sprl Rue Emile Francqui 4 1435 Mont-Saint-Guibert / BE | [2023/50] |
Former [2017/13] | Farmer, Guy Dominic ARC-IP sprl Rue Emile Francqui, 4 1435 Mont-Saint-Guibert / BE | Application number, filing date | 15723506.0 | 19.05.2015 | [2017/13] | WO2015EP60951 | Priority number, date | GB20140008909 | 20.05.2014 Original published format: GB 201408909 | [2017/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015177114 | Date: | 26.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3146010 | Date: | 29.03.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3146010 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C09J179/02, C08G12/06, C09J161/22, C08L61/22, C08L79/02 | [2017/13] | CPC: |
C08L79/02 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B27N1/00 (RU);
C08G73/02 (KR,US);
C09J179/02 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
B27N3/00 (RU);
C03C25/26 (RU);
C07H5/04 (RU);
C08G12/06 (CN);
C08J5/24 (RU);
C08K7/02 (US);
C08L61/22 (CN);
C09D5/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BINDEMITTEL | [2017/13] | English: | BINDERS | [2017/13] | French: | LIANTS | [2017/13] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/13] | 14.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 27.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.2023 | Observations by third parties | 24.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2023 | Observations by third parties | 31.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23214647.2 / EP4324882 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.09.2024
13.09.2024
ADMISSIBLE BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Str. 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE Opponent's representative Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [2024/43] |
Former [2024/42] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.09.2024
BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Str. 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE Opponent's representative Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | 27.09.2024 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 31.03.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 31.03.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.04.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 13.12.2023 | EE | 13.12.2023 | HR | 13.12.2023 | LT | 13.12.2023 | LV | 13.12.2023 | NL | 13.12.2023 | RO | 13.12.2023 | RS | 13.12.2023 | SK | 13.12.2023 | SM | 13.12.2023 | BG | 13.03.2024 | NO | 13.03.2024 | IS | 13.04.2024 | PT | 15.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 13.12.2023 | |
EE | 13.12.2023 | ||
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RO | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SM | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 13.12.2023 | |
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SM | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | HR | 13.12.2023 | |
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SM | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | HR | 13.12.2023 | |
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | HR | 13.12.2023 | |
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | HR | 13.12.2023 | |
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 13.12.2023 | |
BG | 13.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [I]US2007027283 (SWIFT BRIAN L [US], et al) [I] 1-36 * the whole document *; | [I]WO2011138459 (KNAUF INSULATION [BE], et al) [I] 1-36 * the whole document *; | [I]WO2011138458 (KNAUF INSULATION [BE], et al) [I] 1-36 * the whole document *; | [XY]EP2386605 (ROHM & HAAS [US], et al) [X] 33-36 * the whole document * [Y] 1-32; | [Y]EP2386394 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [Y] 1-36 * examples 1,2; table 1 *; | [Y]TW201319192 (KNAUF INSULATION [BE]) [Y] 1-36* abstract *; | [Y]BE1020570 (KNAUF INSULATION [BE]) [Y] 1-36 * the whole document *; | [IP]WO2014086775 (KNAUF INSULATION [BE]) [IP] 1-36 * page 13, lines 19-24 * * page 6, lines 27-32 * * claim 1 * * page 16, line 33 * | other | - Anonymous, "Molmasse - Georg Thieme Verlag KG", RÖMPP's Chemistry Lexicon, (20071201), RÖMPP's Chemistry Lexicon, URL: https://roempp.thieme.de/roempp4.0/do/data/RD-13-02942, (20170206), XP055342419 | - Caseri Walter, "Molmassenverteilung", RÖMPP, Thieme, (20061201), pages 1 - 2, XP093040672 | - Neupert Manfred, "Molmassenbestimmung", Römpp, Thieme, (20040801), pages 1 - 6, XP093040673 | - Römpp Redaktion Zahlenmittel-Römpp, "Zahlenmittel", Römpp, Thieme, (20020301), pages 1 - 1, XP093040677 | - Hanselmann Ralf, "Massenmittel", Römpp, Thieme, (20080801), pages 1 - 2, XP093040737 |