EP3145873 - METHOD FOR THE TREATMENT OF SOLIDS AND LIQUIDS, AND OF CONTAMINATED SOIL AND BODIES OF WATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/13] | METHOD AND TECHNICAL PROCESS FOR THE TREATMENT OF SOLIDS AND LIQUIDS, AND OF CONTAMINATED SOIL AND BODIES OF WATER | ||
[2019/08] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.2020 Database last updated on 09.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pommersheim, Rainer Kupferbergterrasse 21 55116 Mainz / DE | [2019/37] |
Former [2017/13] | For all designated states POMMERSHEIM, Rainer Kupferbergterrasse 21 55116 Mainz / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2017/13] | Representative(s) | Kruspig, Volkmar Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | [2017/13] | Application number, filing date | 15723520.1 | 20.05.2015 | [2017/13] | WO2015EP61139 | Priority number, date | DE20141007294 | 20.05.2014 Original published format: DE102014007294 | [2017/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015177225 | Date: | 26.11.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3145873 | Date: | 29.03.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3145873 | Date: | 11.09.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/26, C02F1/469, C22B3/00, B01D11/00, B09B3/00, B09C1/02, B09B5/00, C02F11/00, C02F1/52, C02F1/42, C02F1/46, C02F103/16, C02F103/10, C02F101/20, C02F1/04 | [2017/13] | CPC: |
C02F1/26 (EP,CN);
B09B3/10 (EP,CN);
B09B3/80 (EP,CN);
C02F1/469 (EP,CN);
C02F11/002 (EP,CN);
C22B3/42 (EP,CN);
C22B7/006 (EP,CN);
B01D11/04 (EP);
C02F1/048 (EP,CN);
C02F1/42 (EP,CN);
C02F1/52 (EP,CN);
C02F2001/007 (EP,CN);
C02F2101/006 (EP,CN);
C02F2101/20 (EP,CN);
C02F2103/10 (EP,CN);
C02F2103/16 (EP,CN);
C02F2303/24 (EP,CN);
C02F2303/26 (EP,CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BEHANDELN VON FESTSTOFFEN UND FLÜSSIGKEITEN, SOWIE BELASTETEM ERDREICH UND GEWÄSSERN | [2019/08] | English: | METHOD FOR THE TREATMENT OF SOLIDS AND LIQUIDS, AND OF CONTAMINATED SOIL AND BODIES OF WATER | [2019/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE SOLIDES ET DE LIQUIDES AINSI QUE DE SOLS ET D'EAUX CONTAMINÉS | [2019/08] |
Former [2017/13] | VERFAHREN UND TECHNISCHER PROZESS ZUM BEHANDELN VON FESTSTOFFEN UND FLÜSSIGKEITEN, SOWIE BELASTETEM ERDREICH UND GEWÄSSERN | ||
Former [2017/13] | METHOD AND TECHNICAL PROCESS FOR THE TREATMENT OF SOLIDS AND LIQUIDS, AND OF CONTAMINATED SOIL AND BODIES OF WATER | ||
Former [2017/13] | PROCÉDÉ ET PROCESSUS TECHNIQUE DE TRAITEMENT DE SOLIDES ET DE LIQUIDES AINSI QUE DE SOLS ET D'EAUX CONTAMINÉS | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/13] | 08.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.05.2015 | AL | 11.09.2019 | CY | 11.09.2019 | CZ | 11.09.2019 | DK | 11.09.2019 | EE | 11.09.2019 | FI | 11.09.2019 | HR | 11.09.2019 | LT | 11.09.2019 | LV | 11.09.2019 | MC | 11.09.2019 | MK | 11.09.2019 | MT | 11.09.2019 | PL | 11.09.2019 | RO | 11.09.2019 | RS | 11.09.2019 | SE | 11.09.2019 | SI | 11.09.2019 | SK | 11.09.2019 | SM | 11.09.2019 | TR | 11.09.2019 | BG | 11.12.2019 | NO | 11.12.2019 | GR | 12.12.2019 | IS | 12.01.2020 | IE | 20.05.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 20.05.2015 | |
AL | 11.09.2019 | ||
CY | 11.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
MC | 11.09.2019 | ||
MT | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
TR | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
IE | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
MC | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
IE | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
MC | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | FI | 11.09.2019 | |
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 11.09.2019 | |
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 11.09.2019 | |
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 11.09.2019 | |
NO | 11.12.2019 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9914160 (BRITISH NUCLEAR FUELS PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-10 * page 1, line 1 - page 6, line 30 * * page 10, line 5 - page 13, line 2 *; | [X]US2011155635 (SERBAN MANUELA [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0002] , [0013] - [0035] *; | [XI]CN102643988 (UNIV SW SCI & TECH SWUST) [X] 1,2,5-10 * abstract * [I] 3,4; | [X]DE102011080230 (HELMHOLTZ ZENTRUM DRESDEN [DE], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0002] , [0009] - [0059] - [0075] - [0076] *; | [X]WO2014058312 (STICHTING WETSUS CT EXCELLENCE SUSTAINABLE WATER TECHNOLOGY [NL]) [X] 1-10 * page 1, lines 1-23 * * page 6, line 3 - page 8, line 16 * * page 12, lines 19-22 * * page 17, line 3 - page 24, line 8 * * page 29, line 18 - page 30, line 9 *; | [XI] - HSU S C N ET AL, "Extracting Cu(II) from aqueous solutions with hydrophobic room-temperature ionic liquid in the presence of a pyridine-based ionophore to attempt Cu recovery: A laboratory study", ELECTROCHIMICA ACTA, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, BARKING, GB, vol. 54, no. 6, doi:10.1016/J.ELECTACTA.2008.09.068, ISSN 0013-4686, (20090215), pages 1744 - 1751, (20081015), XP025882366 [X] 1,2,4-10 * page 1744 - page 1750 * [I] 3 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.electacta.2008.09.068 | [XI] - JINGYING MA ET AL, "Application of ionic liquids in organic pollutants control", JOURNAL OF ENVIRONMENTAL MANAGEMENT, ACADEMIC PRESS, LONDON, GB, vol. 99, doi:10.1016/J.JENVMAN.2012.01.013, ISSN 0301-4797, (20120114), pages 104 - 109, (20120119), XP028403581 [X] 1,2,5-10 * page 104 - page 108 * [I] 3,4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jenvman.2012.01.013 |