EP3145972 - RADIATION CURABLE AQUEOUS COMPOSITIONS WITH CONTROLLED POLYMER FLOW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.03.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Allnex Belgium S.A. Anderlechtstraat 33 1620 Drogenbos / BE | [2022/33] |
Former [2017/38] | For all designated states Allnex Belgium S.A. Anderlechtstraat 33 1620 Drogenbos / BE | ||
Former [2017/13] | For all designated states Allnex Belgium, S.A. Square Marie-Curie 11 1070 Brussels / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TIELEMANS, Michel Avenue Roi Albert I 63 B-1780 Wemmel / BE | 02 /
SALVIATO, Jean-Yves 54 Rue de Sart Dames Avelines B-6210 Les Bons Villers / BE | 03 /
BAURANT, Jean-Noël Bronstraat 4 B-1700 Dilbeek / BE | [2017/13] | Representative(s) | Neirynck, Katrien Gerda Noëlla, et al Allnex Belgium, S.A. Patent Department Anderlechtstraat 33 1620 Drogenbos / BE | [2022/33] |
Former [2017/13] | Schoofs, Hilde, et al Anderlechtstraat 33 1620 Drogenbos / BE | Application number, filing date | 15723934.4 | 19.05.2015 | [2017/13] | WO2015EP60998 | Priority number, date | EP20140169199 | 21.05.2014 Original published format: EP 14169199 | [2017/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015177151 | Date: | 26.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3145972 | Date: | 29.03.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3145972 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/67, C08G18/73, C08G18/81, C08G18/08, C08G18/22, C08L75/16 | [2017/13] | CPC: |
C09D175/16 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C08G18/673 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C08G18/0823 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C08G18/227 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C08G18/73 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C08G18/8175 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C08L75/16 (CN)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08G18/673, C08G18/0823 (CN,EP,US);
C08G18/8175, C08G18/0823 (US,CN,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STRAHLUNGSHÄRTBARE WÄSSRIGE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT KONTROLLIERTEM POLYMERFLUSS | [2017/13] | English: | RADIATION CURABLE AQUEOUS COMPOSITIONS WITH CONTROLLED POLYMER FLOW | [2017/13] | French: | COMPOSITIONS AQUEUSES DURCISSABLES PAR RAYONNEMENT AVEC RÉGULATION DE DÉBIT DE POLYMÈRE | [2022/11] |
Former [2017/13] | COMPOSITIONS AQUEUSES DURCISSABLES PAR UN RAYONNEMENT DOTÉES D'UN ÉCOULEMENT RÉGULÉ DU POLYMÈRE | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/13] | 07.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.07.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 17.08.2022 | CZ | 17.08.2022 | EE | 17.08.2022 | FI | 17.08.2022 | HR | 17.08.2022 | LT | 17.08.2022 | LV | 17.08.2022 | MC | 17.08.2022 | NL | 17.08.2022 | RO | 17.08.2022 | RS | 17.08.2022 | SI | 17.08.2022 | SK | 17.08.2022 | SM | 17.08.2022 | NO | 17.11.2022 | GR | 18.11.2022 | IS | 17.12.2022 | PT | 19.12.2022 | [2024/08] |
Former [2023/37] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | CZ | 17.08.2022 | |
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | CZ | 17.08.2022 | |
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2009270581 (TIELEMANS MICHEL [BE], et al) [X] 1-18 * example 1 *; | [X]US2011112244 (VAN HOLEN JURGEN [BE], et al) [X] 1-18* paragraph [0074]; example 1; table 1 * |