EP3145894 - BIOCERAMIC COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BBL Technology Transfer GmbH & Co. KG Ostring 18 73269 Hochdorf / DE | [2017/18] |
Former [2017/13] | For all designated states BBL Technology Transfer GmbH & Co. KG Nürnberger Str. 39 90562 Heroldsberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BILLAU, Karl Bahnhofstrasse 31 91233 Neunkirchen / DE | 02 /
KIEFER, Gundula Humboldtstrasse 32 73249 Wernau / DE | 03 /
BURGER, Wolfgang Mühlhaldenweg 75 73207 Plochingen / DE | [2017/13] | Representative(s) | Fleck, Hermann-Josef Jeck, Fleck & partner mbB Patentanwälte Klingengasse 2 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/13] | Fleck, Hermann-Josef Jeck & Fleck Patentanwälte Klingengasse 2 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | Application number, filing date | 15724240.5 | 18.05.2015 | [2017/13] | WO2015EP60889 | Priority number, date | EP20140168854 | 19.05.2014 Original published format: EP 14168854 | [2017/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015177089 | Date: | 26.11.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3145894 | Date: | 29.03.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/119, C04B35/44, A61L27/10, C04B35/111, C04B35/80 | [2017/13] | CPC: |
C04B35/44 (EP,US);
C04B35/119 (EP,RU,US);
A61L27/10 (RU);
A61L27/105 (EP);
C04B35/6455 (RU);
C04B35/80 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3222 (EP);
C04B2235/3224 (EP);
C04B2235/3225 (EP);
C04B2235/3227 (EP);
C04B2235/3229 (EP);
C04B2235/3246 (EP);
C04B2235/78 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/13] | Title | German: | BIOKERAMISCHES BAUTEIL | [2017/13] | English: | BIOCERAMIC COMPONENT | [2017/13] | French: | ÉLÉMENT BIOCÉRAMIQUE | [2017/13] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/13] | 17.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/11] | 10.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2006070201 (MAGNESIUM ELEKTRON LTD [GB], et al); | [YD]WO2008040813 (RAUTER VITA ZAHNFABRIK [DE], et al); | [YD]WO2011000390 (SKF AB [SE], et al); | [YD]US2012308837 (SCHLECHTRIEMEN NADJA [AT], et al); | [YD]EP2684555 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]); | Examination | EP3071522 |