EP3140038 - AMMONIA SLIP CATALYST HAVING PLATINUM IMPREGNATED ON HIGH POROSITY SUBSTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.08.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson Matthey Public Limited Company 5th Floor 25 Farringdon Street London EC4A 4AB / GB | [2017/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FEDEYKO, Joseph 9308 Chevers Drive Glen Mills, PA 19342 / US | 02 /
CHEN, Hai-Ying 320 Arden Road Conshohocken, PA 19428 / US | [2017/11] | Representative(s) | Johnson Matthey Plc Intellectual Property Department Belasis Avenue Billingham TS23 1LB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/11] | Turberville, Simon Johnson Matthey PLC Gate 20 Orchard Road Royston, Herts SG8 5HE / GB | Application number, filing date | 15724451.8 | 08.05.2015 | [2017/11] | WO2015US29852 | Priority number, date | US201461990963P | 09.05.2014 Original published format: US 201461990963 P | [2017/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015172000 | Date: | 12.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3140038 | Date: | 15.03.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B01J37/03, B01J23/42, B01J23/44, B01D53/94, B01J29/072, B01J35/04, B01J35/10, B01J37/02, F01N3/00, B01J29/72, B01J29/76 | [2017/11] | CPC: |
B01J29/763 (EP,KR,US);
B01J37/0244 (EP,KR,US);
B01J23/42 (EP,CN,GB,KR,US);
B01J37/02 (GB);
B01D53/94 (GB);
B01D53/9418 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01J21/04 (KR,US);
B01J21/063 (KR,US);
B01J21/08 (KR,US);
B01J23/44 (EP,CN,GB,KR,US);
B01J29/072 (EP,GB,KR,US);
B01J29/72 (GB);
B01J29/723 (CN);
B01J29/76 (GB);
B01J35/19 (EP,KR,US);
B01J35/394 (US);
B01J35/56 (GB,KR,US);
B01J35/60 (CN,GB);
B01J37/0246 (EP,US);
B01J37/03 (GB);
F01N3/00 (GB);
B01D2255/1021 (EP,US);
B01D2255/1023 (EP,US);
B01D2255/2042 (EP,US);
B01D2255/2045 (EP,US);
B01D2255/2047 (EP,US);
B01D2255/2063 (EP,US);
B01D2255/2065 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20707 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20715 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20723 (EP,US);
B01D2255/2073 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20738 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20746 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20753 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20761 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20769 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20776 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20784 (EP,US);
B01D2255/2094 (EP,US);
B01D2255/30 (EP,US);
B01D2255/50 (EP,US);
B01J2229/186 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/11] | Title | German: | AMMONIAKSCHLUPFKATALYSATOR MIT AUF HOCHPORÖSEN SUBSTRATEN IMPRÄGNIERTEM PLATIN | [2017/11] | English: | AMMONIA SLIP CATALYST HAVING PLATINUM IMPREGNATED ON HIGH POROSITY SUBSTRATES | [2017/11] | French: | CATALYSEUR DE CONVERSION D'AMMONIAC DANS LEQUEL DU PLATINE EST IMPRÉGNÉ SUR DES SUBSTRATS DE POROSITÉ ÉLEVÉE | [2017/11] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/11] | 30.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2009246103 (OHNO KAZUSHIGE [JP], et al) [X] 1-7,9-12,15,22-25 * paragraphs [0070] , [0071] , [0090] - [0099] * [Y] 8,13,16,18,19; | [XY]US2010196221 (ANDO RYUJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-12,15,20-25 * paragraphs [0173] - [0180] * [Y] 8,13,16,18,19; | [XY]US2011078997 (BOORSE R SAMUEL [US], et al) [X] 1-12,14,15,17,22-25 * paragraphs [0066] , [0070] * [Y] 8,13,16,18,19; | [X]WO2012138405 (JOHNSON MATTHEY PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-6,8-11,14,15,22-25 * page 22, line 30 - page 23, line 6 * * page 23, line 7 - line 31 *; | [Y]US2013156668 (SPURK PAUL [DE], et al) [Y] 8 * paragraph [0008] *; | [Y]US8568674 (SUNG SHIANG [US], et al) [Y] 8,16,18,19 * column 11, line 64 * * column 11, line 66 - column 12, line 4 *; | [Y]US2014044630 (SWALLOW DANIEL [GB], et al) [Y] 13 * paragraphs [0014] , [0015] *; | [AP]WO2014083431 (JOHNSON MATTHEY PLC [GB]) [AP] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [AP]WO2014120645 (JOHNSON MATTHEY PLC [GB], et al) [AP] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [AP]WO2015017516 (JOHNSON MATTHEY PLC [GB], et al) [AP] 1-25* the whole document * | by applicant | US4010238 | US4085193 |