EP3109288 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING HYDROLYSED COLLAGEN FOR TANNING AND RETANNING LEATHER WITH WET-BLUE LEATHER WASTE, AND PRODUCT OBTAINED USING SAID METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.08.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Quimica Stoever S.A. De C.V. Av. Industriales 502 Fracc. Julián de Obregón, León 37290 Guanajuato / MX | [2016/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DÍAZ PÉREZ, Ramón San Nicolás de Bari 717-12 Privadas Las Margaritas 45138 Zapopan - Jalisco / MX | [2016/52] | Representative(s) | Isern Patentes y Marcas S.L. Avda. Diagonal, 463 Bis, 2° 08036 Barcelona / ES | [2022/04] |
Former [2016/52] | Isern-Jara, Nuria J. Isern Patentes y Marcas Avda. Diagonal 463 Bis 2° 08036 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 15724502.8 | 03.06.2015 | [2016/52] | WO2015MX00084 | Priority number, date | MX20150005865 | 08.05.2015 Original published format: MX 2015005865 | [2016/52] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016182418 | Date: | 17.11.2016 | Language: | ES | [2016/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3109288 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3109288 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 17.11.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C09H1/04, C09H5/00, C14C3/00, C08L89/06, C14C3/08, C14C3/32 | [2017/12] | CPC: |
C08L89/06 (EP);
C14C3/06 (EP);
C14C3/08 (EP);
C14C3/10 (EP);
C14C3/28 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2016/52] | C09H1/04, C09H5/00, C14C3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR REPARATUR VON HYDROLYSIERTEM KOLLAGEN ZUM GERBEN UND ZUM NACHGERBEN VON LEDER MIT WET-BLUE-LEDERABFÄLLEN UND PRODUKT AUS DIESEM VERFAHREN | [2016/52] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING HYDROLYSED COLLAGEN FOR TANNING AND RETANNING LEATHER WITH WET-BLUE LEATHER WASTE, AND PRODUCT OBTAINED USING SAID METHOD | [2016/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRÉPARATION DE COLLAGÈNE HYDROLYSÉ POUR LE TANNAGE ET LE TANNAGE RENOUVELÉ DE CUIRS AVEC DES REBUTS DE CUIR "WET-BLUE", PRODUIT OBTENU AVEC UN TEL PROCÉDÉ | [2016/52] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2015 | Translation filed | 30.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2015 | Search fee paid | 30.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.06.2015 | Examination requested [2016/52] | 30.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.12.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.06.2015 | AL | 26.01.2022 | AT | 26.01.2022 | CY | 26.01.2022 | CZ | 26.01.2022 | DK | 26.01.2022 | EE | 26.01.2022 | ES | 26.01.2022 | FI | 26.01.2022 | HR | 26.01.2022 | LT | 26.01.2022 | LV | 26.01.2022 | MC | 26.01.2022 | MK | 26.01.2022 | MT | 26.01.2022 | NL | 26.01.2022 | PL | 26.01.2022 | RO | 26.01.2022 | RS | 26.01.2022 | SE | 26.01.2022 | SI | 26.01.2022 | SK | 26.01.2022 | SM | 26.01.2022 | BG | 26.04.2022 | NO | 26.04.2022 | GR | 27.04.2022 | IS | 26.05.2022 | PT | 26.05.2022 | GB | 03.06.2022 | IE | 03.06.2022 | LU | 03.06.2022 | BE | 30.06.2022 | CH | 30.06.2022 | FR | 30.06.2022 | LI | 30.06.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 03.06.2015 | |
AL | 26.01.2022 | ||
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CY | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
MK | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
GB | 03.06.2022 | ||
IE | 03.06.2022 | ||
LU | 03.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 03.06.2015 | |
AL | 26.01.2022 | ||
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CY | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
GB | 03.06.2022 | ||
IE | 03.06.2022 | ||
LU | 03.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 03.06.2015 | |
AL | 26.01.2022 | ||
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
GB | 03.06.2022 | ||
IE | 03.06.2022 | ||
LU | 03.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
GB | 03.06.2022 | ||
IE | 03.06.2022 | ||
LU | 03.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
IE | 03.06.2022 | ||
LU | 03.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
IE | 03.06.2022 | ||
LU | 03.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
IE | 03.06.2022 | ||
LU | 03.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
IE | 03.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 26.01.2022 | |
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 26.01.2022 | |
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 26.01.2022 | |
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 26.01.2022 | |
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 26.01.2022 | |
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 26.01.2022 | |
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 26.01.2022 | |
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 26.01.2022 | |
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 26.01.2022 | |
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 26.01.2022 | |
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | NL | 26.01.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XDI]MX2009007196 (SCHMELING WALTER GERHARD STOEVER VON [MX]) [XD] 2-4 * pages 2, 8-9 * [I] 1-4; | [XI]CN101058642 (JINJIANG XINGYE LEATHER PRODUC [CN]) [X] 2-4 * examples 1,2; claims 1,2 * [I] 1; | [XI]CN1298954 (UNIV SICHUAN [CN]) [X] 2-4 * claims 1-13 * [I] 1 | [XI] - MARIA J. FERREIRA ET AL, "Alkaline Hydrolysis of Chromium Tanned Leather Scrap Fibers and Anaerobic Biodegradation of the Products", WASTE AND BIOMASS VALORIZATION, NL, (20130804), vol. 5, no. 4, doi:10.1007/s12649-013-9252-9, ISSN 1877-2641, pages 551 - 562, XP055344597 [X] 2-4 * page 552, column 2, paragraph 7 - page 553, column 2, paragraph 4 * [I] 1 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s12649-013-9252-9 | International search | [A]MX2009007196 (SCHMELING WALTER GERHARD STOEVER VON [MX]) [A] 1-4 * , *; | TW200948972 [ ] (LIU HSU [TW], et al); | CN102559952 [ ] (UNIV SICHUAN, et al) | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index [A] 1-4 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index [A] 1-4 * & * | by applicant | US8328878 | US7651531 | US7753964 | US8358878 |