EP3149285 - METHOD FOR ASSEMBLING A STATOR STAGE OF A GAS TURBINE ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2019 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.11.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 06.01.2021 [2021/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2017/35] |
Former [2017/14] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FENTEM, Jed 6 Chavery Close Arkwright Town Chesterfield S44 5FA / GB | 02 /
JENKINSON, Paul 88 Tall Pines Road Witham St Hughs Lincoln LN6 9RT / GB | [2018/11] |
Former [2017/14] | 01 /
FENTEM, Jed 5 Woodrush Road Lincoln LN2 4TB / GB | ||
02 /
JENKINSON, Paul 88 Tall Pines Road Witham St Hughs Lincoln LN6 9RT / GB | Representative(s) | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/14] | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15725580.3 | 22.05.2015 | [2017/14] | WO2015EP61452 | Priority number, date | EP20140170842 | 02.06.2014 Original published format: EP 14170842 | [2017/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015185382 | Date: | 10.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3149285 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3149285 | Date: | 14.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F01D9/04, F01D11/02 | [2017/14] | CPC: |
F01D9/042 (EP,CN,RU,US);
F01D11/025 (EP,CN,US);
F05D2220/32 (US);
F05D2230/20 (US);
F05D2230/60 (US);
F05D2230/644 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MONTAGE EINER STATORSTUFE EINES GASTURBINENTRIEBWERKS | [2017/14] | English: | METHOD FOR ASSEMBLING A STATOR STAGE OF A GAS TURBINE ENGINE | [2017/14] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ASSEMBLAGE D'UN ÉTAGE DE STATOR D'UN MOTEUR À TURBINE À GAZ | [2017/14] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/14] | 03.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 01.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.12.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.05.2015 | AL | 14.03.2018 | AT | 14.03.2018 | CY | 14.03.2018 | CZ | 14.03.2018 | DK | 14.03.2018 | EE | 14.03.2018 | ES | 14.03.2018 | FI | 14.03.2018 | HR | 14.03.2018 | IT | 14.03.2018 | LT | 14.03.2018 | LV | 14.03.2018 | MC | 14.03.2018 | MK | 14.03.2018 | NL | 14.03.2018 | PL | 14.03.2018 | RO | 14.03.2018 | RS | 14.03.2018 | SE | 14.03.2018 | SK | 14.03.2018 | SM | 14.03.2018 | TR | 14.03.2018 | IE | 22.05.2018 | LU | 22.05.2018 | MT | 22.05.2018 | SI | 22.05.2018 | BE | 31.05.2018 | CH | 31.05.2018 | LI | 31.05.2018 | BG | 14.06.2018 | NO | 14.06.2018 | GR | 15.06.2018 | IS | 14.07.2018 | PT | 16.07.2018 | [2021/01] |
Former [2020/33] | HU | 22.05.2015 | |
AL | 14.03.2018 | ||
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
MK | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
TR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IE | 22.05.2018 | ||
LU | 22.05.2018 | ||
MT | 22.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
IS | 14.07.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/31] | HU | 22.05.2015 | |
AL | 14.03.2018 | ||
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
MK | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
TR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IE | 22.05.2018 | ||
LU | 22.05.2018 | ||
MT | 22.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 22.05.2015 | |
AL | 14.03.2018 | ||
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
TR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IE | 22.05.2018 | ||
LU | 22.05.2018 | ||
MT | 22.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
TR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IE | 22.05.2018 | ||
LU | 22.05.2018 | ||
MT | 22.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
IE | 22.05.2018 | ||
LU | 22.05.2018 | ||
MT | 22.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
IE | 22.05.2018 | ||
LU | 22.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
IE | 22.05.2018 | ||
LU | 22.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
LU | 22.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
DK | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/06] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
MC | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
PT | 16.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
SM | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
AT | 14.03.2018 | ||
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
SK | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
EE | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
PL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RO | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
ES | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 14.03.2018 | |
CY | 14.03.2018 | ||
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
NL | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
LV | 14.03.2018 | ||
RS | 14.03.2018 | ||
SE | 14.03.2018 | ||
BG | 14.06.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | ||
GR | 15.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 14.03.2018 | |
FI | 14.03.2018 | ||
HR | 14.03.2018 | ||
LT | 14.03.2018 | ||
NO | 14.06.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5271714 (SHEPHERD ANDREW [US], et al); | [A]WO2011150025 (SIEMENS ENERGY INC [US], et al); | [A]EP2594743 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) |